This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/19/2022 at 19:56:59 (UTC).

ARA KHOYLYAN VS GEORGE G. BESNILIAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 ARA KHOYLYAN filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against GEORGE G BESNILIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3248

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KHOYLYAN ARA

Defendants

LAW OFFICES OF NAZARETIAN & BESNILIAN INC.

BESNILIAN GEORGE G.

NAZARETIAN LEON G.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

YEE STEVEN R.

Other Attorneys

BLUMBERG JOHN PHILIP

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

10/26/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO ADVANCE THE H...)

10/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO ADVANCE THE H...)

Answer - ANSWER [PROPOSED] ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF ARA KHOYLYANS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

10/15/2021: Answer - ANSWER [PROPOSED] ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF ARA KHOYLYANS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment

10/15/2021: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KARLFELDT SU IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GEORGE G. BESNILIANS MOTION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST HIM PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 473 AND MOTION FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE

10/15/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KARLFELDT SU IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GEORGE G. BESNILIANS MOTION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST HIM PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 473 AND MOTION FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEFENDANT GEORGE G. BESNILIAN IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST HIM PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 473 AND MOTION FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF

10/15/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEFENDANT GEORGE G. BESNILIAN IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST HIM PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 473 AND MOTION FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT GEORGE G. BESNILIAN'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO ADVANCE THE HEARING ON HIS MOTION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST HIM PURSUANT TO

10/21/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT GEORGE G. BESNILIAN'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO ADVANCE THE HEARING ON HIS MOTION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST HIM PURSUANT TO

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

9/30/2021: Answer

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/20/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/20/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/20/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/23/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/23/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

9/16/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/3/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

7/15/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2022
  • Hearing03/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Default Prove Up Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • Hearing03/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Default Prove Up Hearing - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by George G. Besnilian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (FOR AN ORDER TO ADVANCE THE HEARING ON HIS MOTION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST HIM PURSUANT TO C.C.P.473 AND MOTION FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF 2,125.00 DOLLARS AGAINST PLAINTIFF'S) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER TO ADVANCE THE H...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application (for an Order to Advance the Hearing on his Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default Against him Pursuant to CCP 473 and Motion for Monetary Sanctions in the Amount of $2,125.00 Against Plaintiffs); Filed by George G. Besnilian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (OF DEFENDANT GEORGE G. BESNILIAN IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST HIM PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 473 AND MOTION FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF 2,125 AGAINST PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 473(c)(1)); Filed by George G. Besnilian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (OF KARLFELDT SU IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GEORGE G. BESNILIANS MOTION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST HIM PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 473 AND MOTION FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF 2,125 AGAINST PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL PURSUANT TO C.C.P.); Filed by George G. Besnilian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer ([PROPOSED] ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF ARA KHOYLYAN?S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT); Filed by George G. Besnilian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Ara Khoylyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Ara Khoylyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Ara Khoylyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ara Khoylyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ara Khoylyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ara Khoylyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLUMBERG JOHN