Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2021 at 21:59:28 (UTC).

APRIL MOUTON VS ROBERT HUEBEL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 APRIL MOUTON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ROBERT HUEBEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7554

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOUTON APRIL

Defendants

HANNULA HOLLY ANNE

HUEBEL ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DINSMORE SCOTT DONALD

Defendant Attorney

ALLARIA MARC V.

 

Court Documents

Answer

4/6/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

3/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

3/15/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

3/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

3/17/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/25/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2024
  • Hearing02/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • Hearing08/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • Hearing08/11/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Robert Huebel (Defendant); Holly Anne Hannula (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by April Mouton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by April Mouton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by April Mouton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by April Mouton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by April Mouton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DINSMORE SCOTT D.