This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2021 at 17:13:46 (UTC).

APRIL MILLER VS UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 APRIL MILLER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6443

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MILLER APRIL

Defendants

RASIER LLC

RASIER-CA LLC

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOMINGO MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/4/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2024
  • Hearing09/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • Hearing04/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • Hearing03/20/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by April Miller (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by April Miller (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by April Miller (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rasier-CA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOMINGO MICHAEL