This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/14/2023 at 12:53:51 (UTC).

APRIL GASTON VS CHLOES APARTMENTS LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 APRIL GASTON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHLOES APARTMENTS LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MEL RED RECANA and MICHAEL P. LINFIELD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7645

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MEL RED RECANA

MICHAEL P. LINFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GASTON APRIL

Defendants

APARTMENT MANAGEMENT GROUP LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

CHLOES APARTMENTS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ELOISE WILLIAMS A TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAMS TRUST

GAYLORD WILLIAMS A TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAMS TRUST

WILLIAMS ELOISE

WILLIAMS GAYLORD

CRYSTAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAVI DANIEL

Defendant Attorneys

DEMASON MICHELLE R.

CARPENTER GREGORY J.

WEBB LANE ELLIS

OBERRECHT KIMBERLY SUZANNE

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/30/2023: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)

1/30/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

1/6/2023: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: RELATING WI...)

1/4/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: RELATING WI...)

Request for Dismissal

12/23/2022: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

12/19/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/19/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/13/2022: Case Management Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF AL RE MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY

9/21/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF AL RE MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MTC FURTHER DISCOVERY

9/21/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MTC FURTHER DISCOVERY

Separate Statement

9/21/2022: Separate Statement

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

9/21/2022: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Separate Statement

9/21/2022: Separate Statement

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

9/21/2022: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Separate Statement

9/20/2022: Separate Statement

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

9/20/2022: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MTC FURTHER RFP RESPONSES

9/20/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MTC FURTHER RFP RESPONSES

Notice of Related Case

8/24/2022: Notice of Related Case

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2024
  • Hearing07/01/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2024
  • Hearing06/21/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2024
  • Hearing06/21/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • Hearing05/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Waive Additional Court Fees (Superior Court): Filed By: April Gaston (Plaintiff); Result: Denied ; Result Date: 01/30/2023 ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: April Gaston (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by: CRYSTAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC (Defendant); As to: April Gaston (Plaintiff); Total Costs: 484.20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 07/01/2024 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) scheduled for 06/21/2024 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: April Gaston (Plaintiff); As to: CHLOES APARTMENTS LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); APARTMENT MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); ELOISE WILLIAMS (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: April Gaston (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: April Gaston (Plaintiff); As to: CHLOES APARTMENTS LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); APARTMENT MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); ELOISE WILLIAMS (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: April Gaston (Plaintiff); As to: CHLOES APARTMENTS LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); APARTMENT MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); ELOISE WILLIAMS (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: April Gaston (Plaintiff); As to: CHLOES APARTMENTS LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); APARTMENT MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); ELOISE WILLIAMS (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: April Gaston (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mel Red Recana in Department 45 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less