This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2023 at 14:27:12 (UTC).

APPLIED UNDERWRITERS, INC., A NEBRASKA CORPORATION VS SBB ROOFING, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/16/2022 APPLIED UNDERWRITERS, INC , A NEBRASKA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SBB ROOFING, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9272

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

APPLIED UNDERWRITERS INC. A NEBRASKA CORPORATION

Defendant

SBB ROOFING INC. DBA BILT-WELL ROOF AND MATERIAL CO. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALLIN MICHAEL ADAM

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

11/3/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT) OF 10/11/2022, JUDGMENT

10/11/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT) OF 10/11/2022, JUDGMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

10/11/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Judgment

10/10/2022: Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/6/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

10/5/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Dismissal

10/4/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT / REJECTED

10/4/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT / REJECTED

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

10/4/2022: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

9/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

7/11/2022: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/17/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/18/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/18/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/13/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/16/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

4/19/2022: Proof of Personal Service

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: Applied Underwriters, Inc., a Nebraska corporation (Plaintiff); As to: SBB Roofing, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order re Default Judgment)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order re Default Judgment) of 10/11/2022, Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment scheduled for 10/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Applied Underwriters, Inc., a Nebraska corporation against Defendant SBB Roofing, Inc. DBA Bilt-Well Roof and Material Co. a California corporation on the Complaint filed by Applied Underwriters, Inc., a Nebraska corporation on 03/16/2022 for damages of $32,819.92 and costs of $435.00 for a total of $33,254.92.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketJudgment; Signed and Filed by: Applied Underwriters, Inc., a Nebraska corporation (Plaintiff); As to: SBB Roofing, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment: Filed By: Applied Underwriters, Inc., a Nebraska corporation (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 10/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Applied Underwriters, Inc., a Nebraska corporation on 03/16/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Applied Underwriters, Inc., a Nebraska corporation, does All Doe Defendants Only

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Applied Underwriters, Inc., a Nebraska corporation (Plaintiff); As to: SBB Roofing, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketDefault entered as to SBB Roofing, Inc. On the Complaint filed by Applied Underwriters, Inc., a Nebraska corporation on 03/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Complaint: As To Parties changed from SBB Roofing, Inc. (Defendant) to SBB Roofing, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Applied Underwriters, Inc., a Nebraska corporation (Plaintiff); As to: SBB Roofing, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Applied Underwriters, Inc., a Nebraska corporation (Plaintiff); As to: SBB Roofing, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Applied Underwriters, Inc., a Nebraska corporation (Plaintiff); As to: SBB Roofing, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michelle Williams Court in Department 74 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SBB ROOFING INC. AKA BILT WELL ROOF AND MATERIAL CO A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Applied Underwriters, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALLIN MICHAEL ADAM