This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/17/2022 at 17:20:01 (UTC).

APPLIED RISK SERVICES, INC. FOR CALIFORNIA INSURANCE COMPANY AS REAL PARTY IN INTEREST VS C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY INC., WHICH WILL TRANSACT BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA AS C. H. ROBINSON TRANSPORTATION COMPANY INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/08/2019 APPLIED RISK SERVICES, INC FOR CALIFORNIA INSURANCE COMPANY AS REAL PARTY IN INTEREST filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against C H ROBINSON COMPANY INC , WHICH WILL TRANSACT BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA AS C H ROBINSON TRANSPORTATION COMPANY INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5991

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

APPLIED RISK SERVICES INC. FOR CALIFORNIA INSURANCE COMPANY AS REAL PARTY IN INTEREST

Defendants

WESTROCK SERVICES LLC

WESTROCK MWV LLC

WESTROCK CP LLC

WESTROCK CONVERTING LLC

WESTROCK PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

C.H. ROBINSON COMPANY INC. WHICH WILL TRANSACT BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA AS C. H. ROBINSON TRANSPORTATION COMPANY INC.

Not Classified By Court

RICARDO E. AREVALO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CAPALBO CHRISTOPHER JOHN

TRAUT ERIC

CAPALBO CHRISTOPHER JOHN ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

DELANOY TALIA LEIA

MCEVOY STEVEN J.

DELANOY TALIA LEIA ESQ.

MCEVOY STEVEN JOHN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

12/16/2020: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

11/5/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

10/20/2020: Request for Dismissal

Motion for Leave to Intervene

9/22/2020: Motion for Leave to Intervene

Notice of Settlement - NOTICE TO INJURED WORKER, RICARDO AREVALO, OF THIRD PARTY SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO LABOR CODE SECTIONS 3859 AND 3860

7/23/2020: Notice of Settlement - NOTICE TO INJURED WORKER, RICARDO AREVALO, OF THIRD PARTY SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO LABOR CODE SECTIONS 3859 AND 3860

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

6/3/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Answer

2/26/2020: Answer

Answer

12/30/2019: Answer

Request for Dismissal

12/23/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER APPOINTING COMMISSIONER AS CONSERVATOR OF CALIFORNIA INSURANCE COMPANY AND ENJOINING PROCEEDINGS [INSURANCE CODE 1020]

11/20/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER APPOINTING COMMISSIONER AS CONSERVATOR OF CALIFORNIA INSURANCE COMPANY AND ENJOINING PROCEEDINGS [INSURANCE CODE 1020]

Proof of Personal Service

11/13/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/13/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/13/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/13/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/13/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/13/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/18/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

11/18/2019: PI General Order

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Applied Risk Services, Inc. for California Insurance Company as real party in interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Applied Risk Services, Inc. for California Insurance Company as real party in interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Applied Risk Services, Inc. for California Insurance Company as real party in interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketMotion for Leave to Intervene; Filed by Applied Risk Services, Inc. for California Insurance Company as real party in interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketNotice to Injured Worker, Ricardo Arevalo, of Third Party Settlement Pursuant to Labor Code Sections 3859 and 3860; Filed by Applied Risk Services, Inc. for California Insurance Company as real party in interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Christopher John Capalbo, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by C.H. Robinson Company Inc., which will transact business in California as C. H. Robinson Transportation Company Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Applied Risk Services, Inc. for California Insurance Company as real party in interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Applied Risk Services, Inc. for California Insurance Company as real party in interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Applied Risk Services, Inc. for California Insurance Company as real party in interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Applied Risk Services, Inc. for California Insurance Company as real party in interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Applied Risk Services, Inc. for California Insurance Company as real party in interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Action Pursuant to Labor Code Section3853); Filed by Applied Risk Services, Inc. for California Insurance Company as real party in interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Applied Risk Services, Inc. for California Insurance Company as real party in interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Applied Risk Services, Inc. for California Insurance Company as real party in interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Applied Risk Services, Inc. for California Insurance Company as real party in interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Westrock Converting LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Westrock Packaging Systems LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTROCK CP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Westrock Services LLC is a litigant