This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/01/2017 at 10:14:30 (UTC).

APP WINDOWN LLC VS IRIS ALONZO ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/13/2017 APP WINDOWN LLC filed an Other lawsuit against IRIS ALONZO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0881

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

HUBNER JAN WILLEM

MARTIN KRISTA

GALINDO DIANNE

APP WINDOW LLC

AMERICAN APPAREL INC

HONDA PATRICIA

Respondents and Defendants

CRESPO CAROLINA

ALONZO IRIS

CHUNG KYUNG

MENDEZ ALBINA

NISENBAUM DAVID

RAMOS RENE

MIYASHIRO TOKIKO

PABLO JEREMIAS

MORALES WILLY SONTAY

NG CHO YEE

WU JIAO JIOA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BARBER JOHN L. ESQ.

Respondent Attorney

KEITH A. FINK & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

9/13/2017: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

9/13/2017: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

PETITION FOR ORDER CONSOLIDATING ARBITRATIONS BEFORE SINGLE ARBITRATOR AND ETC

9/13/2017: PETITION FOR ORDER CONSOLIDATING ARBITRATIONS BEFORE SINGLE ARBITRATOR AND ETC

NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO CONSOLIDATE

9/22/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO CONSOLIDATE

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF HELEN M. LUETTO IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR ORDER CONSOLIDATING ARBITRATIONS ETC.

9/22/2017: SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF HELEN M. LUETTO IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR ORDER CONSOLIDATING ARBITRATIONS ETC.

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

9/21/2017: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

Minute Order

9/21/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE

9/29/2017: NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE

RESPONDENTS ALONZO ET AL.''S OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR ORDER CONSOLIDATING ARBITRATIONS; ETC

10/12/2017: RESPONDENTS ALONZO ET AL.''S OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR ORDER CONSOLIDATING ARBITRATIONS; ETC

RESPONIWNTS? EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF COLLEEN BROWN IN SUPPORT OF HIS OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO CONSOLIDATE MATTERS BEFORE SINGLE ARBITRATOR

10/12/2017: RESPONIWNTS? EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF COLLEEN BROWN IN SUPPORT OF HIS OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO CONSOLIDATE MATTERS BEFORE SINGLE ARBITRATOR

DECLARATION OF SARAH E. HERNANDEZ IN SUPPORT OF RESPONDENTS ALONZO ET AL'S OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR ORDER CONSOLIDATING ARBITRATIONS

10/12/2017: DECLARATION OF SARAH E. HERNANDEZ IN SUPPORT OF RESPONDENTS ALONZO ET AL'S OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR ORDER CONSOLIDATING ARBITRATIONS

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

10/5/2017: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR ORDER CONSOLIDATING ARBITRATIONS BEFORE SINGLE ARBITRATOR AND FOR INJUNCTIVE ORDER TO STAY INDIVII)UAL ARBITRATION PROCEEDINGS

10/23/2017: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR ORDER CONSOLIDATING ARBITRATIONS BEFORE SINGLE ARBITRATOR AND FOR INJUNCTIVE ORDER TO STAY INDIVII)UAL ARBITRATION PROCEEDINGS

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketReply/Response (IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR ORDER CONSOLIDATING ARBIRTATIONS BEFORE SINGLE ARBITRATOR AND FOR INJUNCTIVE ORDER TO STAY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketOpposition Document (TO PETITION FOR ORDER CONSOLIDATING ARBITRATIONS ) Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketDeclaration (OF SARAH E. HERNANDEZ ) Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketObjection Document (EVIDENTIARY - TO THE DECLARATION OF COLLEEN BROWN ) Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketNotice (OF STATUS CONFERENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketNotice of Filing (PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketSupplemental Declaration Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketNotice of Hearing (ON PETITION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference filed Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketNotice-Related Cases Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketPetition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less