This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2019 at 00:34:55 (UTC).

AP VS COMPTON UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 06/16/2017 AP filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COMPTON UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARC D. GROSS and JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5393

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARC D. GROSS

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Guardian Ad Litem and Plaintiff

MITCHELL-PATTERSON JENNY

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1 TO 20

JAN DOE

COMPTON UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

WILSON MICHELE AKA JANE DOE

Minor

A.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Minor and Plaintiff Attorney

SECK IBIERE

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

MILTON E. FOSTER III

III MILTON E. FOSTER

KENNIX MARVIN LANCE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF COMPTON UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC

9/29/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF COMPTON UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC

DEFENDANT COMPTON UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT OF PLATNTIFF A.P., A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, JENNY MITCHELL-PATTERSON; ETC

9/29/2017: DEFENDANT COMPTON UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT OF PLATNTIFF A.P., A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, JENNY MITCHELL-PATTERSON; ETC

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/28/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SUMMONS

7/26/2017: SUMMONS

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

7/20/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

6/21/2017: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

6/16/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

6/16/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

DEFENDANT COMPTON UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

10/30/2017: DEFENDANT COMPTON UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC

10/20/2017: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC

ORDER RE: DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

11/6/2017: ORDER RE: DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

Minute Order

11/6/2017: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF M. LANCE KENNIX IN SUPPORT OF COMPTON UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S DEMURRER

12/6/2017: DECLARATION OF M. LANCE KENNIX IN SUPPORT OF COMPTON UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S DEMURRER

Minute Order

12/21/2017: Minute Order

ORDER (1) OVERRULING THE DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; AND (2) DENYING THE MOTION TO STRIKE

12/21/2017: ORDER (1) OVERRULING THE DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; AND (2) DENYING THE MOTION TO STRIKE

DEFENDANT COMPTON UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION FOR NEGLIGENCE AND SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION FOR NEGLIGENT HIRING, SUPERVISION, TRAINING, AND RETENTION

1/12/2018: DEFENDANT COMPTON UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION FOR NEGLIGENCE AND SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION FOR NEGLIGENT HIRING, SUPERVISION, TRAINING, AND RETENTION

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Filed by Compton Unified School District (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF M. LANCE KENNIX IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT COMPTON UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION); Filed by Compton Unified School District (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by Compton Unified School District (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion) - Held - Motion Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketOrder (By the Court denying Motion to Reclassify case as complex/Denying motion to bifurcate without prejudice); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketOpposition (Compton Unified School District's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Designate and Reclassify Case as Complex); Filed by Compton Unified School District (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of M. Lance Kennix In Support of Compton Unified School District's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Designate and Reclassify Case as Complex); Filed by Compton Unified School District (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketOrd Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****5393    Hearing Date: December 04, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

A.P.,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

COMPTON UNIFIED SCHOOL DIST., et al.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: ****5393

[TENATATIVE] ORDER CONDITIONALLY GRANTING PETITION TO APPROVE MINOR’S COMPROMISE

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

December 4, 2019

Plaintiff filed this action against Defendant for damages arising out of a fall at Defendant’s school. Plaintiff is now seventeen years of age, but was just shy of fifteen years old when the accident occurred; Plaintiff was in a class for students with special needs at Defendant’s school. Plaintiff suffered two broken ankles as a result of the fall, continues to have pain when he walks long distances, and may need additional surgery in the future.

At this time Plaintiff, by and through his GAL and attorney of record, has agreed to settle all claims with Defendant for the total amount of $582,000. If the settlement is approved, $26,137.64 will be used for medical expenses, $203, 700 for attorneys’ fees, and $19,005.88 for costs of suit. $300,000 will be used to purchase a single premium deferred annuity, and the remaining $33,156.48 will be placed in a blocked account.

The Court has reviewed the settlement and finds it fair and reasonable. The Court also finds the 35% contingency fee fair and reasonable concerning the difficulty and duration of the litigation.

Per CRC 7.952, Petitioner and Plaintiff must appear at the hearing unless the Court finds good cause to excuse their appearance. Plaintiff is seventeen years old, and the Court will therefore require him to personally appear and testify. If Plaintiff’s special needs are such that he cannot meaningfully appear and testify, Petitioner should be prepared to address those needs at the time of the hearing. If the Court is satisfied with Plaintiff’s and Petitioner’s testimony at the hearing, the petition will be granted.

Petitioner is ordered to give notice.

Dated this 4th day of December, 2019

Hon. Jon Takasugi

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where COMPTON UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SECK IBIERE