Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/27/2021 at 15:09:32 (UTC).

AO, JENNIFER VU VS AO, JOHN

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 AO, JENNIFER VU filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against AO, JOHN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0138

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AO JENNIFER VU

Respondent

AO JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STENZEL ANH NGUYEN

 

Court Documents

Judgment Package Received - Stipulated - - Rejected.

3/25/2021: Judgment Package Received - Stipulated - - Rejected.

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

4/16/2021: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Proof of Service - -FAULTY- why filed by petnr

4/16/2021: Proof of Service - -FAULTY- why filed by petnr

Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition

3/9/2021: Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition

Proof of Service of Summons - by mailed FL-117

3/9/2021: Proof of Service of Summons - by mailed FL-117

Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure - -faulty as to Final Dec. (not dated).

3/12/2021: Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure - -faulty as to Final Dec. (not dated).

Summons

2/8/2021: Summons

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

2/8/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

2/8/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Notice - Case Assignment

2/8/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

2/8/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - Stipulated (Received. ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (-FAULTY- why filed by petnr ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - Stipulated (- Rejected. ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure (-faulty as to Final Dec. (not dated). ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketNotice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (by mailed FL-117 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STENZEL ANH NGUYEN