This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2020 at 12:00:56 (UTC).

ANZHEY BARANTSEVICH ET AL VS P4C GLOBAL INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/06/2017 ANZHEY BARANTSEVICH filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against P4C GLOBAL INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4016

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Cross Defendants

ZOOOM INC.

BARANTSEVICH ANZHEY

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

OEM BATTERY DEPOT LLC

DOES 1 THROUGH 25

HOPWOOD STEVEN

P4C GLOBAL INC.

Not Classified By Court

CAMERON BEAU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

CHALEFF DANIEL

PARRIS R. REX ESQ.

WOO FELIX T. ESQ.

WOO FELIX T.

LIM S. YOUNG

YEREMIAN ARPINEH

MITILIAN ARMEN

Defendant, Respondent and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

FLORES MICHELLE LEE ESQ.

MEPPEN DEBRA ELLWOOD ESQ.

DIPIETRA ANTHONY ESQ.

DIPETRA RONALD ANTHONY

DIPIETRA RONALD ANTHONY ESQ.

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

YEREMIAN ARPINEH

 

Court Documents

Association of Attorney

10/9/2020: Association of Attorney

Notice of Lien

8/25/2020: Notice of Lien

Proof of Service by Mail

8/25/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Lien

8/18/2020: Notice of Lien

Answer

4/1/2020: Answer

Substitution of Attorney

4/2/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Order - ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME AND ADVANCING THE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CROSS-COMPLAINT

1/8/2020: Order - ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME AND ADVANCING THE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CROSS-COMPLAINT

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION PLAINTIFF ANZHEY BARANTSEVICHS NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND APPLICATION TO SET TRIAL SCHEDULE

8/20/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION PLAINTIFF ANZHEY BARANTSEVICHS NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND APPLICATION TO SET TRIAL SCHEDULE

Notice of Ruling

6/20/2019: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RULING RE PLAINTIFFS ANZHEY BARANTZEVICH AND ZOOOM, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRIORITY ORDER OF DEPOSITIONS

4/25/2019: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RULING RE PLAINTIFFS ANZHEY BARANTZEVICH AND ZOOOM, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRIORITY ORDER OF DEPOSITIONS

Declaration - Declaration of Felix T. Woo and Proposed Order Submitted Concurrently

2/20/2019: Declaration - Declaration of Felix T. Woo and Proposed Order Submitted Concurrently

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

3/4/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

DECLARATION OF TAMAR KARAGUEZIAN ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

4/2/2018: DECLARATION OF TAMAR KARAGUEZIAN ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Notice of Change of Address -

4/5/2018: Notice of Change of Address -

PLAINTIFFS ANZHEY BARANTSEVICN AND Z000M, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS P4C GLOBAL, INC. AND STEVEN HOPWOOD'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; ETC

4/25/2018: PLAINTIFFS ANZHEY BARANTSEVICN AND Z000M, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS P4C GLOBAL, INC. AND STEVEN HOPWOOD'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; ETC

DEFENDANTS P4C GLOBAL INC. AND STEVEN HOPWOOD'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

5/2/2018: DEFENDANTS P4C GLOBAL INC. AND STEVEN HOPWOOD'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

7/24/2017: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

9/25/2017: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

87 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2022
  • Hearing04/19/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • Hearing04/11/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • Hearing02/10/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Anzhey Barantsevich (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Discovery Responses) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Production of Documents) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Beau Cameron (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Lien; Filed by Beau Cameron (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Lien); Filed by Anzhey Barantsevich (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
174 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Anzhey Barantsevich (Plaintiff); Zooom, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1) BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Anzhey Barantsevich (Plaintiff); Zooom, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC664016    Hearing Date: January 06, 2020    Dept: 61

Plaintiffs Anzhey Barantzevich and Zooom, Inc.’s Motion to Compel Access to Quickbooks Password of P4C Global, Inc. and OEM Battery Depot, LLC is GRANTED.

  1. MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE

Plaintiffs move to compel Defendants P4C Global, Inc. and OEM Battery Depot, LLC to allow access to Quickbooks database files that Defendants have produced to Plaintiffs, but which remain useless because they are password-protected. The court construes this motion as one to compel compliance under Code of Civil Procedure § 2031.320:

If a party filing a response to a demand for inspection, copying, testing, or sampling under Sections 2031.210, 2031.220, 2031.230, 2031.240, and 2031.280 thereafter fails to permit the inspection, copying, testing, or sampling in accordance with that party's statement of compliance, the demanding party may move for an order compelling compliance.

(Code Civ. Proc. § 2031.320, subd. (a).)

Plaintiffs contend that in response to their Fourth Set of Requests for Production, Defendants have produced Quickbooks files, but that these files remain password-protected and inaccessible to Plaintiffs. (Woo Decl. ¶ 6.) During meet-and-confer efforts, Defendants attempted to limit access to the Quickbooks files under the argument that the files contained private information. (Woo Decl. Exh. E.) But Defendants have presented no opposition or argument here supporting that contention. In addition, the court notes that a protective order is already in place in this matter as of October 22, 2018.

Accordingly, Plaintiffs’ Motion to Compel is GRANTED.