This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2021 at 04:35:48 (UTC).

ANZHELA ASATRYAN VS JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY;, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 ANZHELA ASATRYAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5012

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASATRYAN ANZHELA

Defendants

JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY;

TERRY YORK MOTOR CARS LTD. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA LAND ROVER ENCINO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KALOUSTIAN HARRY S

Defendant Attorney

WOLF MATTHEW C.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

8/26/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/19/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/19/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

8/19/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

8/23/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

7/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/7/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/7/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/8/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • Hearing01/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company; (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company; (Defendant); TERRY YORK MOTOR CARS, LTD., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by ANZHELA ASATRYAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by ANZHELA ASATRYAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by ANZHELA ASATRYAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ANZHELA ASATRYAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ANZHELA ASATRYAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ANZHELA ASATRYAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ANZHELA ASATRYAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ANZHELA ASATRYAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TERRY YORK MOTOR CAR LTD DBA LAND ROVER ENCINO A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOLF MATTHEW C.