This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2020 at 17:18:14 (UTC).

ANUSHAVAN HARUTUNYAN VS ROLLS-ROYCE MOTOR CARS NA, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 ANUSHAVAN HARUTUNYAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROLLS-ROYCE MOTOR CARS NA, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0172

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARUTUNYAN ANUSHAVAN

Defendants

RUSNAK PASADENA BUSINESS FORM UNKNOWN

ROLLS-ROYCE MOTOR CARS NA LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KESHISHIAN ARNO HILL

Defendant Attorney

VILLEGAS DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/6/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Answer

3/16/2020: Answer

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/11/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/11/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/11/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/13/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/13/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2020
  • Hearing07/22/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • Hearing07/22/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Rolls-Royce Motor Cars NA, LLC a limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Anushavan Harutunyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Anushavan Harutunyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Anushavan Harutunyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.