This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/23/2023 at 14:18:27 (UTC).

ANUSH KHACHATURYAN VS CITY OF MONTEBELLO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/19/2022 ANUSH KHACHATURYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF MONTEBELLO,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3059

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KHACHATURYAN ANUSH

Defendants

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

CITY OF MONTEBELLO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MENASSIAN DRO

Defendant Attorney

DELGADILLO PAUL

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/19/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

4/19/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/19/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/19/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/19/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/19/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

4/19/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/19/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

4/19/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

5/18/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/18/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

6/8/2022: Answer

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDERS

6/23/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDERS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERV...)

6/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERV...)

Request for Dismissal

8/4/2022: Request for Dismissal

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

3/1/2023: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2025
  • Hearing04/15/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2024
  • Hearing02/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2024
  • Hearing02/01/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Signed and Filed by: the People of the State of California, acting by and through the Department of Transportation erroneously sued as STATE OF CALIFORNIA Erroneously Sued As California Department of Transportation (Defendant); As to: Anush Khachaturyan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for 10/03/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 02/01/2024 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 02/14/2024 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:2733167 resulted in empty message

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Anush Khachaturyan on 04/19/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Anush Khachaturyan as to City of Montebello

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Anush Khachaturyan (Plaintiff); As to: City of Montebello (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders: Filed By: City of Montebello (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 06/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 04/15/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Audra Mori in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Anush Khachaturyan (Plaintiff); As to: City of Montebello (Defendant); California Department of Transportation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Anush Khachaturyan (Plaintiff); As to: City of Montebello (Defendant); California Department of Transportation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less