This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/11/2021 at 02:31:57 (UTC).

ANUSH GINOSYAN VS BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT (CA), INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 ANUSH GINOSYAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CA , INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1556

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CA INC.

INTERNATIONAL COFFEE & TEA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

AIVAZI ZHANA

AVANESSIAN ARPA

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT / DEFAULT REJECTED

8/13/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT / DEFAULT REJECTED

Proof of Personal Service

8/13/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

8/16/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/21/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

7/26/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/22/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

6/24/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

4/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

4/7/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/25/2021: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2024
  • Hearing03/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • Hearing09/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • Hearing09/08/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Anush Ginosyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment (/ Default Rejected); Filed by Anush Ginosyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Anush Ginosyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Anush Ginosyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Anush Ginosyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Anush Ginosyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Anush Ginosyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERNATIONAL COFFEE & TEA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES MANAGMENT CA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AVANESSIAN ARPA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AIVAZI ZHANA