This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/24/2021 at 13:15:12 (UTC).

ANTRICE CORDER VS RED LOBSTER ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/11/2017 ANTRICE CORDER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RED LOBSTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4671

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

BRIMMER-CORDER ANTRICE

CORDER ANTRICE

CORDER LASHONDA BRIMMER

CORDER ANTRICE BRIMMER

Defendants

FLORES DAVID

GOLDEN GATE CAPITAL MANAGEMENT II L.L.C.

RED LOBSTER MANAGEMENT LLC

RED LOBSTER HOSPITALITY LLC

LOBSTER RED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ARIAS MIKE

YAZDANPANAH HAMED L ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

LENKOV JEFFREY MYLES ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

1/12/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

1/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE) OF 10/30/2020

10/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE) OF 10/30/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

10/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

Notice of Settlement

10/30/2020: Notice of Settlement

Notice of Ruling

1/29/2020: Notice of Ruling

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

2/7/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: APRIL 06, 2020)

3/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: APRIL 06, 2020)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: APRIL 06, 2020) OF 03/23/2020

3/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: APRIL 06, 2020) OF 03/23/2020

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/27/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

7/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Motion to Continue Trial Date

12/6/2019: Motion to Continue Trial Date

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

1/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

Motion to Quash

7/12/2019: Motion to Quash

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH AND/OR PROTECTIVE ORDER CONCERNING SUBPOENA FOR INSURANCE RECORDS OF PLAINTIFF ANTRICE CORDER

7/31/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH AND/OR PROTECTIVE ORDER CONCERNING SUBPOENA FOR INSURANCE RECORDS OF PLAINTIFF ANTRICE CORDER

Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO THE MOTIONTO QUASH SUBPOENAS FOR INSURANCE RECORDS OF PLAINTIFF ANTRICE CORDER

8/6/2019: Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO THE MOTIONTO QUASH SUBPOENAS FOR INSURANCE RECORDS OF PLAINTIFF ANTRICE CORDER

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO THE MOTIONTO QUASH SUBPOENAS FOR INSURANCE RECORDS OF PLAINTIFF ANTRICE CORDER

8/6/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO THE MOTIONTO QUASH SUBPOENAS FOR INSURANCE RECORDS OF PLAINTIFF ANTRICE CORDER

Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS FOR INSURANCE RECORDS OF PLAINTIFF ANTRICE CORDER

8/7/2019: Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS FOR INSURANCE RECORDS OF PLAINTIFF ANTRICE CORDER

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Red Lobster Hospitality LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • Docketat 09:39 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE) of 10/30/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Red Lobster Hospitality LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketSTIPULATION RE DISMISSAL OF GOLDEN GATE CAPITAL LLP;AND ETC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL OF GOLDEN GATE CAPITAL LLP; GOLDEN GATE CAPITAL LLC; AND GOLDEN GATE CAPITAL MANAGEMENT II, LLC, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Red Lobster Hospitality LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Red Lobster Hospitality LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (NEGLIGENCE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Antrice Corder (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Antrice Corder (Plaintiff); Antrice Brimmer Corder (Legacy Party); Antrice Brimmer-Corder (Legacy Party) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****4671    Hearing Date: January 06, 2020    Dept: 5

 

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

antrice corder,

Plaintiff,

v.

Red lobster, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: ****4671

Hearing Date: January 6, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

plaintiff’s MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Plaintiff Antrice Corder (“Plaintiff”) sued Defendant Red Lobster Hospitality LLC (“Defendant”) based on injuries she sustained in a slip and fall accident. Plaintiff moves to continue the trial date, currently set for February 4, 2020, to April 20, 2020 because the parties have not completed discovery. Per California Rules of Court, rule 3.1332, a trial continuance may be appropriate due to “[a] party’s excused inability to obtain essential testimony, documents, or other material evidence despite diligent efforts. . . .” (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1332, subdivision (c).) Here, Plaintiff relies on a declaration of counsel, Katherine Harvey-Lee (“Counsel”). Counsel states that the parties had scheduled numerous depositions from late September through early October, but the death of Counsel’s father on September 19, 2019 caused Counsel’s unavailability to conduct those depositions. While the parties have sought to reschedule those depositions now that Counsel has returned to the office, the fact that Defendant is a restaurant has made scheduling of the depositions of its employees during the holiday season difficult. This is “an affirmative showing of good cause” that supports the requested continuance. Defendant has stipulated to the continuance. Accordingly, the motion is granted. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1332 (c).)

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

The Court grants Plaintiff’s motion to continue. The final status conference and trial dates are advanced and vacated. The Court sets the following dates:

Final Status Conference: April 6, 2020, at 10:00 a.m.

Trial: April 22, 2020, at 8:30 a.m.

The discovery and motions cut-off shall be based on the new trial date. There shall be no further continuances of this matter. Plaintiff shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: January 6, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RED LOBSTER HOSPITALITY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RED LOBSTER MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LENKOV JEFFREY MYLES