Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/29/2021 at 01:35:25 (UTC).

ANTONIO VIEYRA SALINAS VS COMPTON CAR WASH INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/23/2018 ANTONIO VIEYRA SALINAS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against COMPTON CAR WASH INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE, LAURA A. SEIGLE and RAMONA G. SEE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9366

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

LAURA A. SEIGLE

RAMONA G. SEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SALINAS ANTONIO VIEYRA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-25

AMINPOUR JOSEPH

COMPTON CAR WASH INC.

AMINPOUR ABRAHIM

DOES 1 THROUGH 25

AMINPOUR ABRAHIM AKA JOSEPH AMINPOUR AN INDIVIDUAL

AMINPOUR MICHAEL AKA MASOUD AMINPOUR

AMINPOUR YOOSEF AKA JOSEPH AMINPOUR

AMINPOUR AHARON

AMINPOUR DOE 1 AHARON

AMINPOUR DOE 3 MICHAEL AKA

AMINPOUR DOE 2 YOOSEF AKA

AMINPOUR ABRAHIM AKA JOSEPHN AMINPOUR

AMINPOUR DOE 2 YOOSEF AKA JOSEPH AMINPOUR

AMINPOUR DOE 3 MICHAEL AKA MASOUD AMINPOUR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

TWOMEY J B. ESQ

J.B. TWOMEY LAW

JAIN LAW OFFICES

LAW J.B. TWOMEY

JAIN KUNAL

TWOMEY J. B.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BITTON OPHIR J. ESQ.

BITTON & ASSOCIATES

BITTON OPHIR J.

 

Court Documents

Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF ANTONIO VIEYRA SALINAS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION FOR ISSUE, EVIDENTIARY AND/OR MONETARY SANCTIONS, AGAINST DEFENDANTS FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER

12/9/2019: Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF ANTONIO VIEYRA SALINAS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION FOR ISSUE, EVIDENTIARY AND/OR MONETARY SANCTIONS, AGAINST DEFENDANTS FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PLAINTIFF ANTONIO VIEYRA SALINAS' MOTION FOR SANCT...)

12/2/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PLAINTIFF ANTONIO VIEYRA SALINAS' MOTION FOR SANCT...)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JAMES L. HANGER III IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF ANTONIO VIEYRA SALINAS MOTION TO COMPEL THE DIVISION OF LABOR STANDARDS ENFORCEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF INDUSTRIAL RELA

11/19/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JAMES L. HANGER III IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF ANTONIO VIEYRA SALINAS MOTION TO COMPEL THE DIVISION OF LABOR STANDARDS ENFORCEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF INDUSTRIAL RELA

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION NOTICE AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR PLAINTIFF ANTONIO VIEYRA SALINAS MOTION TO COMPEL THE DIVISION OF LABOR STANDARDS ENFORCEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF INDUSTRIAL

11/19/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION NOTICE AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR PLAINTIFF ANTONIO VIEYRA SALINAS MOTION TO COMPEL THE DIVISION OF LABOR STANDARDS ENFORCEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF INDUSTRIAL

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING THE HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFF ANTONIO VIEYRA SALINAS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL

11/4/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING THE HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFF ANTONIO VIEYRA SALINAS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL

Request for Judicial Notice

11/4/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ISSUE AND/OR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANTS

11/12/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ISSUE AND/OR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANTS

Proof of Personal Service

11/1/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

11/4/2019: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION

8/26/2019: Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVA...)

9/12/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVA...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER SETTING MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC)) OF 09/30/2019

9/30/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER SETTING MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC)) OF 09/30/2019

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER SETTING MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

10/11/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER SETTING MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Order - JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT COMPTON CAR WASH, INC.'S PERSON MOST QUALIFIED AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE

10/11/2019: Order - JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT COMPTON CAR WASH, INC.'S PERSON MOST QUALIFIED AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

8/16/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/30/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

4/30/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. VIOLATIONS OF CAL. LABOR CODE 1197 & 1194 ;ETC

3/23/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. VIOLATIONS OF CAL. LABOR CODE 1197 & 1194 ;ETC

73 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Re Dismissal); Filed by Antonio Vieyra Salinas (Plaintiff); Abrahim Aminpour Erroneously Sued As Abrahim Aminpour (Defendant); Compton Car Wash, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal ("NOT ENTERED"); Filed by Antonio Vieyra Salinas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (RE SETTLEMENT); Filed by Antonio Vieyra Salinas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department STL-D, Ramona G. See, Presiding; MSC Timeslot (Judge Ramona G See)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketNotice (Regarding Remote/ Virtual Mandatory Settlement Conference); Filed by Antonio Vieyra Salinas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Antonio Vieyra Salinas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketRequest for Refund / Order; Filed by Antonio Vieyra Salinas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF CONTINUED MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Antonio Vieyra Salinas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
99 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Real Party in Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Antonio Vieyra Salinas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketRequest-Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. VIOLATIONS OF CAL. LABOR CODE 1197 & 1194 ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC699366    Hearing Date: December 16, 2019    Dept: 48

MOTION FOR ISSUE AND/OR MONETARY SANCTIONS

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff Antonio Vieyra Salinas

RESPONDING PARTY(S): Defendants Compton Car Wash, Inc. and Abrahim Aminpour

PROOF OF SERVICE:

ANALYSIS

Motion for Issue and/or Monetary Sanctions

Plaintiff moves for issue and/or monetary sanctions against Defendants for failure to comply with the October 11, 2019 court order. On October 24, 2019, Plaintiff took the deposition of Defendant’s PMQ, Aharon Aminpour. Defendant refused to provide any responsive documents and did not come up to speed as to the enumerated deposition topics.

Given that the trial date has been vacated, the Court finds that a motion to compel responses at deposition and production of documents pursuant to CCP 2025.480, which applies where a deponent fails to answer any question or produce any document, is more appropriate.

Accordingly, the motion for issue/evidentiary sanctions and monetary sanctions is DENIED.

Case Number: BC699366    Hearing Date: December 02, 2019    Dept: 48

MOTION FOR ISSUE AND/OR MONETARY SANCTIONS

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiffs Antonio Vieyra Salinas

RESPONDING PARTY(S): Defendants Compton Car Wash, Inc. and Abrahim Aminpour

PROOF OF SERVICE:

ANALYSIS

Motion for Issue and/or Monetary Sanctions

Defendants untimely served and filed an opposition on November 22, 2019. Based on the December 2, 2019 hearing date, and taking the Thanksgiving holidays into account, Defendants’ opposition was due on November 15, 2019.

Although the Court may disregard the untimely opposition, the Court exercises its discretion to consider the merits of the opposition. In this regard, Plaintiffs will be given an opportunity to prepare a reply brief.

The hearing on the motion for issue and/or monetary sanctions is CONTINUED to December 16, 2019. Reply is due December 11, 2019.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BITTON OPHIR JACOB