This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/07/2021 at 07:47:31 (UTC).

ANTONIO PALAFOX VS JI SUK KIM

Case Summary

On 07/21/2020 ANTONIO PALAFOX filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JI SUK KIM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7433

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PALAFOX ANTONIO

Defendant

KIM JI SUK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TISHBI PAYAM

Defendant Attorney

RENAUD LISA L

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/21/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/21/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

8/4/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

8/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/14/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

9/4/2020: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

9/4/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2023
  • Hearing07/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Hearing01/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • Hearing01/04/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Ji Suk Kim (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ji Suk Kim (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Antonio Palafox (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Antonio Palafox (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Antonio Palafox (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Antonio Palafox (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less