This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/10/2023 at 12:11:27 (UTC).

ANTONIO GUERRERO, VS SHLOMO RECHNITZ, , ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/09/2022 ANTONIO GUERRERO, filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against SHLOMO RECHNITZ, ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5719

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUERRERO ANTONIO

Defendants

BAKERSFIELD HEALTHCARE AND WELLNESS CENTRE LLC.

CITRUS WELLNESS CENTER LLC

RECHNITZ CITRUS GP.

RECHNITZ SHLOMO

ROCKPORT ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL

Defendant Attorneys

MATHUR APARNA S.

JACKSON JONATHAN MICHAEL

CHAN PAUL S.

JOHNSON MARK A.

PANCHAPAKESAN GOPI KRISHNA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Minute Order (Status Conference (Re: Masolele BC711982))

4/12/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Status Conference (Re: Masolele BC711982))

Answer Defendants’ Answer to Complaint for Damages

3/6/2023: Answer Defendants’ Answer to Complaint for Damages

Notice Re: Add-On Petition (name extension) Notice of Court Order Granting Petition for Coordination of Add-On Case

10/5/2022: Notice Re: Add-On Petition (name extension) Notice of Court Order Granting Petition for Coordination of Add-On Case

Notice of Related Case

9/16/2022: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance for Defendants

9/16/2022: Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance for Defendants

Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination Notice Of Submission Of Petition For Coordination Of Add-On Case

9/21/2022: Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination Notice Of Submission Of Petition For Coordination Of Add-On Case

Proof of Personal Service

10/3/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/3/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re: Initial Status Conference)

9/1/2022: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re: Initial Status Conference)

Initial Status Conference Order

9/1/2022: Initial Status Conference Order

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Initial Status Conference) of 09/01/2022, Re: Initial Status Conference

9/1/2022: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Initial Status Conference) of 09/01/2022, Re: Initial Status Conference

Proof of Personal Service

8/29/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service Proof of Service of Summons

8/23/2022: Proof of Personal Service Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Personal Service Proof of Service of Summons

8/23/2022: Proof of Personal Service Proof of Service of Summons

Complaint

8/9/2022: Complaint

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

8/9/2022: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/9/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/9/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/12/2023

DocketMinute Order (Status Conference (Re: Masolele BC711982))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2023

DocketDefendants Answer to Complaint for Damages; Filed by: Shlomo Rechnitz, (Defendant); Bakersfield Healthcare And Wellness Centre, LLC. (Defendant); Citrus Wellness Center, LLC (Defendant); Rechnitz Citrus, GP. (Defendant); Rockport Administrative Services, LLC. (Defendant); As to: Antonio Guerrero, (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2022

DocketUpdated -- Paul S. Chan (Attorney): Organization Name changed from BIRD, MARELLA, BOXER, WOLPERT, NESSIM, DROOKS, LINCENBERG & RHOW, P.C. to Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks, Lincenberg & Rhow, P.C.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2022

DocketNotice of Court Order Granting Petition for Coordination of Add-On Case; Filed by: Shlomo Rechnitz, (Defendant); Bakersfield Healthcare And Wellness Centre, LLC. (Defendant); Citrus Wellness Center, LLC (Defendant); Rechnitz Citrus, GP. (Defendant); Rockport Administrative Services, LLC. (Defendant); JCCP Number: JCCP4988

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2022

DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 7 - Hon. Lawrence P. Riff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2022

DocketInitial Status Conference scheduled for 10/31/2022 at 11:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 6 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 10/05/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2022

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: JCCP Coordinated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2022

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Antonio Guerrero, (Plaintiff); As to: Rechnitz Citrus, GP. (Defendant); Service Date: 09/30/2022; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2022

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Antonio Guerrero, (Plaintiff); As to: Shlomo Rechnitz, (Defendant); Service Date: 09/30/2022; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2022

DocketUpdated -- Notice of Related Case: Filed By: Bakersfield Healthcare And Wellness Centre, LLC. (Defendant),Rockport Administrative Services, LLC. (Defendant),Shlomo Rechnitz, (Defendant),Citrus Wellness Center, LLC (Defendant),Rechnitz Citrus, GP. (Defendant); Result: Reviewed - No Action Required; As To Parties: removed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
08/10/2022

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elihu M. Berle in Department 6 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Antonio Guerrero, (Plaintiff); As to: Shlomo Rechnitz, (Defendant); Bakersfield Healthcare And Wellness Centre, LLC. (Defendant); Citrus Wellness Center, LLC (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Antonio Guerrero, (Plaintiff); As to: Shlomo Rechnitz, (Defendant); Bakersfield Healthcare And Wellness Centre, LLC. (Defendant); Citrus Wellness Center, LLC (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Antonio Guerrero, (Plaintiff); As to: Shlomo Rechnitz, (Defendant); Bakersfield Healthcare And Wellness Centre, LLC. (Defendant); Citrus Wellness Center, LLC (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

[+] Read More [-] Read Less