This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/23/2023 at 01:16:01 (UTC).

ANTONIO FERNANDEZ VS CASA LINDA FURNITURE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/14/2022 ANTONIO FERNANDEZ filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CASA LINDA FURNITURE, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is OLIVIA ROSALES. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1021

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

OLIVIA ROSALES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FERNANDEZ ANTONIO

Defendant

CASA LINDA FURNITURE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GUNDERSON SARA

HANDY RUSSELL CLIVE

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/14/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

10/14/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/14/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/17/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Clerk's Notice of Full Payment of Fees Required

10/17/2022: Clerk's Notice of Full Payment of Fees Required

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/10/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

1/9/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/11/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER SETTING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL) OF 01/30/2023

1/30/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER SETTING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL) OF 01/30/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER SETTING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL)

1/30/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER SETTING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL)

Notice of Settlement

1/30/2023: Notice of Settlement

Proof of Service by Mail

2/8/2023: Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

2/14/2023: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 03/15/2023 at 09:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/15/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Antonio Fernandez on 10/14/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Antonio Fernandez as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal With Prejudice as to Entire Action of All Parties and All Causes of Action; Filed by: Antonio Fernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Casa Linda Furniture, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Antonio Fernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Casa Linda Furniture, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Antonio Fernandez (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 03/15/2023 at 09:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketAddress for Sara Gunderson (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Setting Order to Show Cause Regarding Dismissal)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Setting Order to Show Cause Regarding Dismissal) of 01/30/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/24/2023 at 02:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 01/30/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order To Extend Time to Respond to Complaint: Filed By: Casa Linda Furniture, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 01/09/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Antonio Fernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Casa Linda Furniture, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/03/2022; Service Cost: 35.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/24/2023 at 02:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketClerk's Notice of Full Payment of Fees Required; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Antonio Fernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Margaret Miller Bernal in Department F Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Antonio Fernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Casa Linda Furniture, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Antonio Fernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Casa Linda Furniture, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Antonio Fernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Casa Linda Furniture, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less