Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/06/2020 at 14:46:13 (UTC).

ANTONIECO CANTAN TEVES VS MELVIN ROBERTO MATTA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/02/2019 ANTONIECO CANTAN TEVES filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MELVIN ROBERTO MATTA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7148

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TEVES ANTONIECO CATAN

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

JENSEN HEIDI

MATTA MELVIN ROBERTO

SELPH ISABELLA CLAIRE

JENSEN ZACHARY WINCHESTER

HERNANDEZ-CARRILLO MAGDIEL

SELPH MICHAEL JOHN

SELPH MICHAEL

HERNANDEZ-CARRILO MAGDIEL

ROES 1 THROUGH 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAH AMEER

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

BAKSHANDEH JOSEPH

GIBBS PATRICK JOSEPH

ESMAILIAN ARPINE

AVAKIAN ARMEN ALEXANDER

YOUNG EL MAHDI

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/9/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

10/29/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

8/19/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

8/20/2020: Request for Dismissal

Answer

4/10/2020: Answer

Answer

2/21/2020: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/2/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

3/2/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Cross-Complaint

1/8/2020: Cross-Complaint

Answer

12/31/2019: Answer

Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

12/6/2019: Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer

11/19/2019: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

10/30/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/30/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Cross-Complaint

11/1/2019: Cross-Complaint

PI General Order

8/14/2019: PI General Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/2/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/2/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by ANTONIECO CATAN TEVES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by MAGDIEL HERNANDEZ-CARRILO (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by ISABELLA CLAIRE SELPH (Cross-Complainant); MICHAEL SELPH (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by MELVIN ROBERTO MATTA (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by HEIDI JENSEN (Cross-Complainant); ZACHARY WINCHESTER JENSEN (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by ANTONIECO CATAN TEVES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by MAGDIEL HERNANDEZ-CARRILO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by MICHAEL SELPH (Cross-Defendant); ISABELLA CLAIRE SELPH (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by MICHAEL SELPH (Cross-Defendant); ISABELLA CLAIRE SELPH (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by ZACHARY WINCHESTER JENSEN (Defendant); HEIDI JENSEN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by ISABELLA CLAIRE SELPH (Defendant); MICHAEL SELPH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ANTONIECO CATAN TEVES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ANTONIECO CATAN TEVES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ANTONIECO CATAN TEVES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ANTONIECO CATAN TEVES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ANTONIECO CATAN TEVES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ANTONIECO CATAN TEVES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AVAKIAN ARMEN ALEXANDER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ESMAILIAN ARPINE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAKSHANDEH JOSEPH