Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2021 at 00:24:20 (UTC).

ANTONIA QUROZ SANCHEZ VS LA AMAPOLA, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/03/2019 ANTONIA QUROZ SANCHEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LA AMAPOLA, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5525

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANCHEZ ANTONIA QUROZ

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

LA AMAPOLA INC.

ROES 1 THROUGH 20 INCLUSIVE

Cross Defendant and Defendant

ROES 1 THROUGH 20 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HALPERN JASON SALINAS

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

MOSIER MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/13/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARINGS DUE TO EMERGENCY ORDERS RE:...)

9/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARINGS DUE TO EMERGENCY ORDERS RE:...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARINGS DUE TO EMERGENCY ORDERS RE:...) OF 09/02/2020

9/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARINGS DUE TO EMERGENCY ORDERS RE:...) OF 09/02/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

10/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/12/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Cross-Complaint

9/12/2019: Cross-Complaint

Answer

9/12/2019: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/12/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/7/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/19/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

7/26/2019: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/7/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

5/7/2019: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/3/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/3/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/3/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/3/2019: Complaint

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2022
  • Hearing05/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • Hearing04/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • Hearing04/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Matthew Mosier (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • Docketat 11:12 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Rescheduling Hearings due to Emergency Orders Re:...) of 09/02/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by LA AMAPOLA, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Antonia Quroz Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Antonia Quroz Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Antonia Quroz Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Antonia Quroz Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Antonia Quroz Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Antonia Quroz Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LA AMAPOLA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HALPERN JASON SALINAS