This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2021 at 12:51:27 (UTC).

ANTOINETTE DILLARD VS JACK IN THE BOX OPERATORS ASSOCIATION INC.

Case Summary

On 05/18/2021 ANTOINETTE DILLARD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JACK IN THE BOX OPERATORS ASSOCIATION INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8601

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DILLARD ANTOINETTE

Defendant

JACK IN THE BOX OPERATORS ASSOCIATION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVY HOWARD ALLEN

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/3/2021: PI General Order

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

5/18/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/18/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2024
  • Hearing05/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • Hearing11/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • Hearing11/01/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ANTOINETTE DILLARD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ANTOINETTE DILLARD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVY HOWARD ALLEN ESQ.