This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/08/2020 at 15:47:03 (UTC).

ANTHONY XEPOLIS VS BUILD A DREAM, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/19/2020 ANTHONY XEPOLIS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BUILD A DREAM, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8910

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

XEPOLIS ANTHONY

Defendants

SAFEBUILT INSURANCE SERVICES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA WHOLESALE INSURANCE SERVICES CA DBA PREFERRED CONTRACTORS INSURANCE CO. RISK RETENTION GROUP LLC

BUILD A DREAM INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FURTADO DAVID

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

11/4/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - AMENDED

10/5/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - AMENDED

Proof of Personal Service

10/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

10/23/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/26/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/26/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE

8/27/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE

Declaration re: Due Diligence

6/15/2020: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/27/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/27/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/20/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/19/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/19/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/19/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/19/2020: Complaint

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Anthony Xepolis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Anthony Xepolis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Anthony Xepolis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketAmended; Filed by David Furtado (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Due Diligence); Filed by Anthony Xepolis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Anthony Xepolis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Anthony Xepolis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Anthony Xepolis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Anthony Xepolis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Anthony Xepolis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JNR Builders, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SAFEBUILT INSURANCE SERVICES AKA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FURTADO DAVID