This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/14/2020 at 09:07:10 (UTC).

ANTHONY SONSINI VS KINGMAN INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/08/2018 ANTHONY SONSINI filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against KINGMAN INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE, MARK A. BORENSTEIN and PETER A. HERNANDEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7100

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SONSINI ANTHONY

Defendants and Respondents

KINGMAN INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

DOES 1-50

GI SPORTZ DIRECT LLC

KEE ACTION SPORTS I LLC

KEE ACTION SPORTS II

KEE ACTION SPORTS II LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

CARTER RICHARD D. ESQ.

CARTER RICHARD DAVID ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

RODRIGUEZ MARISA

RODRIGUEZ MARISA ESQ.

HAJIMIRZAEE MARJAN

FOX DANA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/5/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

1/30/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/5/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

11/18/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Motion to Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

11/6/2019: Motion to Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN SUPPORT

11/6/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN SUPPORT

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

11/6/2019: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...) OF 11/08/2019

11/8/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...) OF 11/08/2019

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

11/1/2019: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

Motion to Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

11/1/2019: Motion to Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

Answer

10/21/2019: Answer

Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/21/2019: Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF O...)

10/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF O...)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/1/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/1/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/18/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/18/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

SUMMONS -

3/9/2018: SUMMONS -

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • Hearing02/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • Hearing01/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by GI SPORTZ DIRECT LLC (Defendant); KEE ACTION SPORTS I, LLC (Defendant); KEE ACTION SPORTS II, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (/ Verified Application of Jonathan R. Friedman To Appear As Counsel Pro Hac Vice For The Defendants) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (/ Vefified Application of Ryan T. Gormley To Appear As Counsel Pro Hac Vice for the Defendants) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Anthony Sonsini (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Trial Setting Conference;) of 02/05/2020, Judicial MSC Program guidelines); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Kingman International Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Anthony Sonsini (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Anthony Sonsini (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Anthony Sonsini (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Anthony Sonsini (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Anthony Sonsini (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Anthony Sonsini (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC697100    Hearing Date: December 03, 2019    Dept: 2

AFTER REVIEW OF THE COURT FILE, THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING ORDER:

Department 2 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above-entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in the EAST DISTRICT, POMONA, JUDGE PETER HERNANDEZ presiding in Department 0 for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.