This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2023 at 01:33:41 (UTC).

ANTHONY RAMIREZ VS PATRIOT HYUNDAI OF EL MONTE LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 ANTHONY RAMIREZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PATRIOT HYUNDAI OF EL MONTE LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0281

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMIREZ ANTHONY

Defendants

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

PATRIOT HYUNDAI OF EL MONTE LLC

SANTANDER CONSUMER USA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FALER MATTHEW

Defendant Attorney

HUTCHINSON ADAM A.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/30/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

1/30/2023: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/30/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/30/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/30/2023: Complaint

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE

1/30/2023: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/1/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/1/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/3/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/16/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

4/3/2023: Answer

Request for Dismissal

4/5/2023: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

5/9/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2023
  • Hearing06/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Pomona Courthouse South in Department O - Hon. Christian R. Gulloneffective 05/22/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Anthony Ramirez on 01/30/2023, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Anthony Ramirez as to American Contractors Indemnity Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/06/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Anthony Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Santander Consumer USA LLC (Defendant); As to: Anthony Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Anthony Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: American Contractors Indemnity Insurance Company (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/15/2023; Service Cost: 99.97; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Anthony Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: Santander Consumer USA LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 02/01/2023; Service Cost: 34.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas C. Falls in Department O Pomona Courthouse South

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Anthony Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: Patriot Hyundai of El Monte LLC (Defendant); Santander Consumer USA LLC (Defendant); American Contractors Indemnity Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Anthony Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: Patriot Hyundai of El Monte LLC (Defendant); Santander Consumer USA LLC (Defendant); American Contractors Indemnity Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by: Anthony Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: Patriot Hyundai of El Monte LLC (Defendant); Santander Consumer USA LLC (Defendant); American Contractors Indemnity Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Anthony Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: Patriot Hyundai of El Monte LLC (Defendant); Santander Consumer USA LLC (Defendant); American Contractors Indemnity Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketAffidavit Affidavit of Venue; Filed by: Anthony Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: Patriot Hyundai of El Monte LLC (Defendant); Santander Consumer USA LLC (Defendant); American Contractors Indemnity Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less