Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2021 at 14:46:54 (UTC).

ANTHONY RAMIREZ, BY AND THROUGH GUARDIAN AD LITEM, ET AL. VS CITY OF SANTA CLARITA

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 ANTHONY RAMIREZ, BY AND THROUGH GUARDIAN AD LITEM filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF SANTA CLARITA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7404

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMIREZ EDWIN

Defendant

CITY OF SANTA CLARITA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GORDON KEVIN A.

GORDON KEVIN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

5/20/2021: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

5/20/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Notice of Related Case

3/19/2021: Notice of Related Case

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES) OF 03/24/2021

3/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES) OF 03/24/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES)

3/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

3/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

3/12/2021: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

3/12/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

PI General Order

3/12/2021: PI General Order

Complaint

2/24/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/24/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

2/25/2021: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

2/25/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2024
  • Hearing02/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • Hearing08/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • Hearing08/10/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Anthony Ramirez, by and through guardian ad litem (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • Docketat 1:51 PM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: related cases) of 03/24/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: related cases)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Anthony Ramirez, by and through guardian ad litem (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Anthony Ramirez, by and through guardian ad litem (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Anthony Ramirez, by and through guardian ad litem (Plaintiff); Edwin Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Anthony Ramirez, by and through guardian ad litem (Plaintiff); Edwin Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Anthony Ramirez, by and through guardian ad litem (Plaintiff); Edwin Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF SANTA CLARITA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GORDON KEVIN A.