Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2021 at 15:49:01 (UTC).

ANTHONY NGUYEN VS ST EXOTICS AUTO GROUP LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 ANTHONY NGUYEN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ST EXOTICS AUTO GROUP LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2033

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NGUYEN ANTHONY

Defendants

ST EXOTICS AUTO GROUP LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

TONG PEIJI

ZHANG CHENG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEGERIAN CARNEY RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

6/15/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

6/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED AGAINST THE HONORAB...)

6/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED AGAINST THE HONORAB...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED AGAINST THE HONORAB...) OF 06/16/2021

6/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED AGAINST THE HONORAB...) OF 06/16/2021

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/16/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/14/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/15/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEPARTMENT 69 ONLINE COURTROOM INFORMATION

6/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEPARTMENT 69 ONLINE COURTROOM INFORMATION

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/15/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • Hearing11/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • Docketat 10:03 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Peremptory Challenge filed against the Honorab...) of 06/16/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Peremptory Challenge filed against the Honorab...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Department 69 Online Courtroom Information); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Anthony Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Anthony Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Anthony Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Anthony Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ST EXOTICS AUTO GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shegerian, Carney R