Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/22/2020 at 06:44:21 (UTC).

ANTHONY MICHAEL BANJO VS BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICE, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/17/2020 ANTHONY MICHAEL BANJO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICE, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2400

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANJO ANTHONY MICHAEL

Defendant

BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMERBERG NATHAN

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/17/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/17/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/17/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2023
  • Hearing01/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • Hearing07/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • Hearing07/02/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Anthony Michael Banjo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Anthony Michael Banjo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES INC. is a litigant