This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 11:09:16 (UTC).

ANTHONY MARINKOVIC VS CARTER MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/08/2020 ANTHONY MARINKOVIC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CARTER MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4033

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARINKOVIC ANTHONY

Defendants

THOUSAND PALMS ENTERPRISES INC.

CARTER MANAGEMENT GROUP INC.

AKILIAN DAVID

THE BICYCLE CASINO LP

Not Classified By Court and Defendant

THE BICYCLE CASINO LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

W.ORTHINGTON MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

AGHAKHANI BRYAN SHANT

 

Court Documents

Notice - DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY PLAINTIFF ANTHONY MARINKOVIC TO DEFENDANTS SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

11/3/2021: Notice - DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY PLAINTIFF ANTHONY MARINKOVIC TO DEFENDANTS SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

11/3/2021: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Notice - DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY PLAINTIFF ANTHONY MARINKOVIC TO DEFENDANTS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE

11/3/2021: Notice - DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY PLAINTIFF ANTHONY MARINKOVIC TO DEFENDANTS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE

Notice - DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY PLAINTIFF ANTHONY MARINKOVIC TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS, SET ONE;

11/3/2021: Notice - DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY PLAINTIFF ANTHONY MARINKOVIC TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS, SET ONE;

Notice - DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY PLAINTIFF ANTHONY MARINKOVIC TO DEFENDANTS FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

11/3/2021: Notice - DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY PLAINTIFF ANTHONY MARINKOVIC TO DEFENDANTS FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

10/8/2021: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

10/8/2021: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

10/8/2021: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Separate Statement

10/8/2021: Separate Statement

Separate Statement

10/8/2021: Separate Statement

Separate Statement

10/8/2021: Separate Statement

Separate Statement

10/8/2021: Separate Statement

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

10/8/2021: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Request for Dismissal

4/19/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL TO DFT'S MTS

5/4/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL TO DFT'S MTS

Answer

5/11/2021: Answer

Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

4/1/2021: Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

Substitution of Attorney

2/16/2021: Substitution of Attorney

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2023
  • Hearing09/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • Hearing03/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • Hearing02/22/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • Hearing01/26/2022 at 1:30 PM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • Hearing01/24/2022 at 1:30 PM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • Hearing01/21/2022 at 1:30 PM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • Hearing01/21/2022 at 1:30 PM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • Hearing12/29/2021 at 11:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY PLAINTIFF ANTHONY MARINKOVIC TO DEFENDANT?S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; Filed by The Bicycle Casino, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY PLAINTIFF ANTHONY MARINKOVIC TO DEFENDANT?S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE; Filed by The Bicycle Casino, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Anthony Marinkovic (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketMotion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer (TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES AND CERTAIN OTHER ALLEGATIONS FROM PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT [CCP 435, 436];); Filed by Carter Management Group, Inc. (Defendant); The Bicycle Casino, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Anthony Marinkovic (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedure and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Anthony Marinkovic (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Anthony Marinkovic (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******4033 Hearing Date: March 14, 2022 Dept: 30

The Court wishes to speak to the parties.

All parties are ordered present (remotely or in person) at the hearing.


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE BICYCLE CASINO A PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AGHAKHANI BRYAN SHANT