This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/02/2021 at 15:10:24 (UTC).

ANTHONY JEFFERSON, ET AL. VS BUILD REHABILITATION INDUSTRIES, A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/13/2018 ANTHONY JEFFERSON filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BUILD REHABILITATION INDUSTRIES, A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8299

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JEFFERSON WINNIFER CARROLL

JEFFERSON ANTHONY

Defendants

BUILD REHABILITATION INDUSTRIES A CORPORATION

HONG SEUNG WON AKA MADELEINE AN INDIVIDUAL

DIOSSA FERNANDO

SAUCEDO MARIA GUADALUPE

GUERRERO RAFAEL

GARCIA MONIQUE MARIE

RIGHT CHOICE IN- HOME CARE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SALUSKY ANNA ROBERTA

Defendant Attorneys

KATZ MARC

COULSTON WENDY ELLEN

JIAO JENNIFER

KARIM IMRAAN

 

Court Documents

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

6/29/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE AND ALL OTHER RELEVANT DATES

7/16/2021: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE AND ALL OTHER RELEVANT DATES

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

7/13/2020: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

7/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

7/14/2020: Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTI...)

7/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTI...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTI...) OF 07/14/2020

7/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTI...) OF 07/14/2020

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED TRIAL, FSC, AND RELATED DATES

7/15/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED TRIAL, FSC, AND RELATED DATES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: VERIFICATION OF RESPONSIVE PLE...)

7/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: VERIFICATION OF RESPONSIVE PLE...)

Answer

7/2/2020: Answer

Answer

7/2/2020: Answer

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO DEFENDANT RAFAEL GUERRERO; PROPOSED ORDER

5/14/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO DEFENDANT RAFAEL GUERRERO; PROPOSED ORDER

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY...) OF 06/17/2020, A COPY OF THE MINUTE ORDER ISSUED 06-17-2020.

6/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY...) OF 06/17/2020, A COPY OF THE MINUTE ORDER ISSUED 06-17-2020.

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY...)

6/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY...)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

5/19/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Notice - NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

5/19/2020: Notice - NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

5/1/2020: Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

5/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2022
  • Hearing07/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • Hearing07/15/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department 16; Jury Trial (Est. 10 Days) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department 16; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketNotice (Plaintiff's Notice of Continuance of Trial Date and all other Relevant Dates); Filed by Anthony Jefferson (Plaintiff); Winnifer Carroll Jefferson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Anthony Jefferson (Plaintiff); Winnifer Carroll Jefferson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 16; Non-Jury Trial ((T/E10 days)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Order to Show Cause Re: (Default Judgment as to Deft. Rafael Guerrero) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 16; Further Status Conference (ReRescheduling of FSC and Non-Jury Trial Est. 10 days;) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Anthony Jefferson (Plaintiff); Winnifer Carroll Jefferson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Anthony Jefferson (Plaintiff); Winnifer Carroll Jefferson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Build Rehabilitation Industries, a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Anthony Jefferson (Plaintiff); Winnifer Carroll Jefferson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees; Filed by Anthony Jefferson (Plaintiff); Winnifer Carroll Jefferson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Anthony Jefferson (Plaintiff); Winnifer Carroll Jefferson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Anthony Jefferson (Plaintiff); Winnifer Carroll Jefferson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BUILD REHABILITATION INDUSTRIES is a litigant

Latest cases where Right Choice In Home Care Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KARIM IMRAAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COULSTON WENDY