This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/21/2022 at 19:26:20 (UTC).

ANTHONY J. RAMIREZ,, ET AL. VS GENERAL MOTORS, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/22/2022 ANTHONY J RAMIREZ,, filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0512

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RAMIREZ ANTHONY J.

RAMIREZ MARGARET M.

Defendants

BOULEVARD CADILLAC A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

GENERAL MOTORS LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAYLOR NORMAN F.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/27/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/27/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/22/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/22/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

9/22/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/17/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/19/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2023
  • Hearing02/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • Hearing12/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Anthony J. Ramirez, (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Service Date: 10/11/2022; Service Cost: 95.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Anthony J. Ramirez, (Plaintiff); As to: Boulevard Cadillac, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/13/2022; Service Cost: 96.92; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael P. Vicencia in Department S26 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Anthony J. Ramirez, (Plaintiff); Margaret M. Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Boulevard Cadillac, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Anthony J. Ramirez, (Plaintiff); Margaret M. Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Boulevard Cadillac, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Anthony J. Ramirez, (Plaintiff); Margaret M. Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Boulevard Cadillac, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAYLOR NORMAN F.