This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/10/2023 at 16:42:03 (UTC).

ANTHONY HERNANDEZ VS REYES COCA-COLA BOTTLING, L.L.C., A CORPORATION,, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/01/2022 ANTHONY HERNANDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against REYES COCA-COLA BOTTLING, L L C , A CORPORATION,,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1176

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDEZ ANTHONY

Defendants

ARAW PAUL ANTHONY

REYES COCA-COLA BOTTLING L.L.C. A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHULTZ THOMAS A.

Defendant Attorney

AVETISOVE ARTIN

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/1/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/1/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/1/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/1/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/2/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

11/9/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

2/3/2023: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/24/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

3/2/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/2/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/2/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2023
  • Hearing03/17/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: REYES COCA-COLA BOTTLING, L.L.C., a corporation, (Defendant); PAUL ANTHONY ARAW (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: REYES COCA-COLA BOTTLING, L.L.C., a corporation, (Defendant); PAUL ANTHONY ARAW (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: ANTHONY HERNANDEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: ANTHONY HERNANDEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: REYES COCA-COLA BOTTLING, L.L.C., a corporation, (Defendant); PAUL ANTHONY ARAW (Defendant); As to: ANTHONY HERNANDEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: ANTHONY HERNANDEZ (Plaintiff); As to: REYES COCA-COLA BOTTLING, L.L.C., a corporation, (Defendant); Service Date: 11/03/2022; Service Cost: 129.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/17/2023 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ANTHONY HERNANDEZ (Plaintiff); As to: REYES COCA-COLA BOTTLING, L.L.C., a corporation, (Defendant); PAUL ANTHONY ARAW (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ANTHONY HERNANDEZ (Plaintiff); As to: REYES COCA-COLA BOTTLING, L.L.C., a corporation, (Defendant); PAUL ANTHONY ARAW (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ANTHONY HERNANDEZ (Plaintiff); As to: REYES COCA-COLA BOTTLING, L.L.C., a corporation, (Defendant); PAUL ANTHONY ARAW (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Margaret Miller Bernal in Department F Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less