This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2019 at 06:57:48 (UTC).

ANTHONY HERNANDEZ ET LA VS CHI HUN LEE ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/19/2017 ANTHONY HERNANDEZ ET LA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHI HUN LEE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7518

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

HERNANDEZ ANTHONY

MONTES PEARL

Defendants and Respondents

EAN HOLDINGS

LEE CHI HUN

SHIN SUK

DOES 1 TO 50

HOLDINGS EAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LADERMAN GERALD L. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

CHIDI ELIZABETH M. ESQ.

CHIDI ELIZABETH MKPAYAH

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/29/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

4/16/2018: STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

4/16/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Other -

8/30/2018: Other -

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

9/12/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

Request

10/4/2018: Request

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

3/22/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

3/22/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default

4/26/2019: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default

Declaration

4/26/2019: Declaration

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

5/3/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Order

5/9/2019: Order

Reply

5/10/2019: Reply

Ex Parte Application

5/10/2019: Ex Parte Application

Notice of Ruling

5/13/2019: Notice of Ruling

Order

5/17/2019: Order

Answer

5/20/2019: Answer

SUMMONS

12/19/2017: SUMMONS

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2019
  • Answer; Filed by CHI HUN LEE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by CHI HUN LEE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Order (By the Court granting Motion for Relief From Default); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by PEARL MONTES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Notice (Notice of Filing of Proof of Service); Filed by Gerald L. Laderman, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Notice (Notice of Continuance of Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Civil); Filed by Gerald L. Laderman, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for continuance of trial) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2018
  • Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by ANTHONY HERNANDEZ (Plaintiff); PEARL MONTES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by ANTHONY HERNANDEZ (Plaintiff); PEARL MONTES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC687518    Hearing Date: November 18, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

ANTHONY HERNANDEZ, ET AL.,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

CHI HUN LEE, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC687518

[TENTATIVE] ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

November 18, 2019

Plaintiffs, Pearl Montes and Anthony Hernandez filed this action against Defendants, Chi Hun Lee, Suk Shin, and EAN Holdings for damages arising out of an automobile accident. On 6/25/19, the Court relieved Montes’ attorney from representation; she is now in pro per. On 7/25/19, Hernandez dismissed all of his claims against Defendants.

At this time Defendant, Lee moves to compel Plaintiff, Montes’ deposition. Defendant’s motion does not include a declaration showing a good faith attempt to meet and confer prior to filing the motion. CCP §2025.450(b)(2) provides, “The motion shall be accompanied by a meet and confer declaration under Section 2016.040, or, when the deponent fails to attend the deposition and produce the documents, electronically stored information, or things described in the deposition notice, by a declaration stating that the petitioner has contacted the deponent to inquire about the nonappearance.”

The Court understands that Plaintiff is in pro per and Defendant may believe an attempt to contact her would be futile. The meet and confer requirement is, however, statutory, and there is no exception for self-represented litigants.

Additionally, the Court notes that the notice of deposition includes a demand for production of documents. Defendant failed, however, to satisfy §2025.450(b)(1), which provides, “The motion shall set forth specific facts showing good cause justifying the production for inspection of any document, electronically stored information, or tangible thing described in the deposition notice.” Thus, even if the Court were to grant the motion, the Court would not compel production of documents at the deposition.

The motion to compel is denied. The ruling is without prejudice to Defendant’s right to re-notice the motion after properly meeting and conferring. If Defendant wishes to have an order concerning documents, Defendant must show good cause for production of the documents at issue.

Moving Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.