This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2021 at 15:41:50 (UTC).

ANTHONY GAYFIELD VS MARTHA CASULA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 ANTHONY GAYFIELD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARTHA CASULA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4877

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GAYFIELD ANTHONY

Defendants

CASULA MARTHA

COACH LEASING INC.

COACH USA

PACIFIC COAST ANAHEIM

PACIFIC COAST SIGHTSEEING TOURS AND CHARTERS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CRUZ RAQUEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/22/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2024
  • Hearing09/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • Hearing03/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • Hearing03/08/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Anthony Gayfield (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Anthony Gayfield (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Anthony Gayfield (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Coach Leasing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Pacific Coast Sightseeing Tours and Charters, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where COACH USA INC. DBA MEGABUS WEST LLC AND MEGABUS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRUZ RAQUEL