This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/17/2021 at 09:49:48 (UTC).

ANTHONY FUSCO, ET AL. VS CASEY ADAMS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/16/2021 ANTHONY FUSCO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CASEY ADAMS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0477

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FUSCO ANTHONY

Defendants

ADAMS CASEY

ADAMS CASEY PATRICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZEESMAN ALEXANDER JOSHUA

ZEESMAN DIANA

Defendant Attorney

DEMAIO MICHELLE MARIE BROWN

 

Court Documents

Answer

8/31/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/3/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

6/29/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

6/29/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

6/29/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/16/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2024
  • Hearing06/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • Hearing08/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • Hearing08/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Anthony Fusco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Casey Patrick Adams (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Anthony Fusco (Plaintiff); Anthony Fusco, III (Plaintiff); Vincent Fusco (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Anthony Fusco (Plaintiff); Anthony Fusco, III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Anthony Fusco (Plaintiff); Nicholas Fusco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Anthony Fusco (Plaintiff); Vincent Fusco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Anthony Fusco (Plaintiff); Anthony Fusco, III (Plaintiff); Vincent Fusco (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Anthony Fusco (Plaintiff); Anthony Fusco, III (Plaintiff); Vincent Fusco (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEESMAN DIANA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEESMAN ALEXANDER JOSHUA