This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/13/2022 at 03:18:02 (UTC).

ANTHONY E. PAREDES VS PEYTON CRAMER FORD, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/26/2022 ANTHONY E PAREDES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PEYTON CRAMER FORD, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0321

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAREDES ANTHONY E.

Defendant

PEYTON CRAMER FORD A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLASSEY SHARON

Defendant Attorney

KOLAR ELIZABETH L

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/26/2022: Complaint

Declaration - DECLARATION PLAINTIFFS ELECTION TO RECEIVE SERVICE EXCLUSIVELY BY ELECTRONIC MEANS

4/26/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION PLAINTIFFS ELECTION TO RECEIVE SERVICE EXCLUSIVELY BY ELECTRONIC MEANS

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/26/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/26/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/26/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

5/4/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/10/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/10/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

6/17/2022: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/17/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

6/17/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2022
  • Hearing12/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Peyton Cramer Ford, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Peyton Cramer Ford, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint); Filed by Peyton Cramer Ford, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Anthony E. Paredes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Anthony E. Paredes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (Plaintiffs Election to Receive Service Exclusively By Electronic Means); Filed by Anthony E. Paredes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Anthony E. Paredes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Anthony E. Paredes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Peyton Cramer Ford doing business as Autonation Ford Torrance is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOLAR ELIZABETH L. ESQ.