This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2022 at 21:03:45 (UTC).

ANTHONY DARNELL CALDWELL, JR. VS LYFT, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 ANTHONY DARNELL CALDWELL, JR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LYFT, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2892

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALDWELL ANTHONY DARNELL JR.

Defendants

LYFT INC.

LYFT-AUTO

KIM DANIEL SANG A

A. KIL DANIEL SANG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AKARAGIAN ARMEN

HAROUTUNIAN HENRY H.

HAROUTUNIAN HENRY H. ESQ.

MARDIROSSIAN GARO ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

HAAS TODD RICHARD ESQ.

HAAS TODD R.

BRAUN JEFF ITZHAK ESQ.

BRAUN JEFF I.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED NOT ENTERED-SECTION #2 IS REQUIRED TO BE COMPLETED

4/20/2022: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED NOT ENTERED-SECTION #2 IS REQUIRED TO BE COMPLETED

Request for Dismissal

6/1/2022: Request for Dismissal

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

10/18/2021: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

8/4/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/5/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/5/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2

6/9/2021: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5

6/9/2021: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4

6/9/2021: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6

6/9/2021: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3

6/9/2021: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1

6/9/2021: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

6/17/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Demand for Jury Trial

8/20/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

8/20/2020: Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/29/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Demand for Jury Trial

5/28/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/13/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Anthony Darnell Caldwell, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 29; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (filed not entered-section #2 is required to be completed); Filed by Anthony Darnell Caldwell, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 29; Hearing on Motion for Protective Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by Anthony Darnell Caldwell, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY); Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketMotion in Limine (No. 6 TO EXCLUDE REPTILIAN TACTICS;); Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Not Entered); Filed by Anthony Darnell Caldwell, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) (TO REFLECT CORRECT DEFT'S TRUE NAME FROM DANIEL SANG A. KIM TO DANIEL SANG A. KIL); Filed by Anthony Darnell Caldwell, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Anthony Darnell Caldwell, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Anthony Darnell Caldwell, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Anthony Darnell Caldwell, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Anthony Darnell Caldwell, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LYFT-AUTO is a litigant

Latest cases where Lyft, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAROUTUNIAN HENRY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARDIROSSIAN GARO ESQ.