This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/03/2021 at 16:00:00 (UTC).

ANTHONY CURTIS, ET AL. VS GARDENA HOSPITAL, L.P., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 ANTHONY CURTIS filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GARDENA HOSPITAL, L P . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0974

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CURTIS ANTHONY

Defendants

GARDENA HOSPITAL L.P. DBA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF GARDENA

SANTA FE HOME CARE INC. DBA SANTA FE HOME CARE III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KANG PAUL

 

Court Documents

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

8/23/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

8/23/2021: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/20/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/20/2021: Complaint

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

9/2/2021: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR CECELIA

9/2/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR CECELIA

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2024
  • Hearing08/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • Hearing02/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • Hearing02/03/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Cecelia); Filed by Anthony Curtis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Anthony Curtis (Plaintiff); Cecelia Bethel, , by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Anthony Curtis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Anthony Curtis (Plaintiff); Cecelia Bethel, , by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Anthony Curtis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Anthony Curtis (Plaintiff); Cecelia Bethel, , by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Anthony Curtis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SANTA FE HOME CARE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where GARDENA HOSPITAL L.P. DBA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF GARDENA is a litigant