This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/12/2023 at 09:42:49 (UTC).

ANTHONY BARRERA VS MARTINEZ ONTIME PARCEL, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/30/2022 ANTHONY BARRERA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against MARTINEZ ONTIME PARCEL, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III, MAREN NELSON and YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1095

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

MAREN NELSON

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARRERA ANTHONY

Defendant

MARTINEZ ONTIME PARCEL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARQUEZ JUSTIN F

Defendant Attorney

PARIS ANDREA

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE

1/24/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE

1/13/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE;)

11/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

11/14/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Status Report - JOINT STATUS REPORT

11/8/2022: Status Report - JOINT STATUS REPORT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)

10/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FILING AND SERVING OF NOTICES ...)

8/24/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FILING AND SERVING OF NOTICES ...)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

8/24/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FILING AND SERVING OF MOTION T...)

9/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FILING AND SERVING OF MOTION T...)

Notice of Related Case

8/18/2022: Notice of Related Case

Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT

7/22/2022: Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT

Case Management Order

7/29/2022: Case Management Order

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

7/29/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

7/29/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE- CASE ANYWHERE

7/29/2022: Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE- CASE ANYWHERE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE

4/26/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CASE REASSIGNMENT)

5/2/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CASE REASSIGNMENT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CASE REASSIGNMENT) OF 05/02/2022

5/2/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CASE REASSIGNMENT) OF 05/02/2022

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2023
  • Hearing08/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 9 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • Hearing04/18/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 9 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Continue Status Conference; Filed by: Anthony Barrera (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order to Continue Status Conference: Status Date changed from 01/13/2023 to 01/13/2023 ; Filed By: Martinez OnTime Parcel, Inc. (Defendant),Anthony Barrera (Plaintiff); Result: Entered ; Result Date: 01/13/2023 ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketStipulation and Order to Continue Status Conference; Signed and Filed by: Anthony Barrera (Plaintiff); Martinez OnTime Parcel, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Status Conference scheduled for 01/18/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 9 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 04/18/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 01/18/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Continuing Status Conference;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Status Conference scheduled for 11/15/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 9 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 01/18/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maren Nelson in Department 17 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Anthony Barrera (Plaintiff); As to: Martinez OnTime Parcel, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Anthony Barrera (Plaintiff); As to: Martinez OnTime Parcel, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Anthony Barrera (Plaintiff); As to: Martinez OnTime Parcel, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less