This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2021 at 10:41:04 (UTC).

ANTHONY A PATEL VS PATRICK DECAROLIS ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/05/2017 ANTHONY A PATEL filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against PATRICK DECAROLIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON and MARC MARMARO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7349

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

MARC MARMARO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners, Defendants and Respondents

PACHECO RANDALL

PATEL ANTHONY A.

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Appellant

PATEL ANTHONY A.

Respondents and Defendants

DECAROLIS PATRICK

ROYCE KRISTINA

PACHECO RANDALL

BHATIA SONYA

BHATIA [DOE 4] RAKSHA

RUNCHAL [DOE 1] AKSHAI

RUNCHAL [DOE 3] DIVYA

RUNCHAL [DOE 2] AMIT

DECAROLIS PATRICK JR.

BHATIA [DOE 5] SUMEET

BOREN OSHER & LUFTMAN

STATE BAR CALIFORNIA

UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA REGENTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

OSHER JEREMY J. ESQ.

MCINTIRE CHRISTOPHER

CUMMINGS MCCLOREY DAVIS ACHO & ASSOC

HINDS DESMOND JOSEPH

OSHER JEREMY

MCINTIRE CHRISTOPHER ANTHONY

SCHAEFFER MARK

HINDS DESMOND J.

MCINTIRE CHRISTOPHER A.

OSHER JEREMY J

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

7/29/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Other - - PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL PAPERS FOR THE OMNIBUS MOTION TO SEEK DISQUALIFICATION, CONTINUE HEARING AND TRIAL DATES, CHANGE VENUE, CONSOLIDATE CIVIL CASES AND OTHER ASSOCIATED RELIEF; DECLARAT

8/6/2019: Other - - PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL PAPERS FOR THE OMNIBUS MOTION TO SEEK DISQUALIFICATION, CONTINUE HEARING AND TRIAL DATES, CHANGE VENUE, CONSOLIDATE CIVIL CASES AND OTHER ASSOCIATED RELIEF; DECLARAT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JEREMY J. OSHER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SONYA PATEL AND SUMEET BHATIA'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S OMNIBUS MOTION TO SEEK DISQUALIFICATION, CONTINUE HEARING AND TRIAL DATE

8/15/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JEREMY J. OSHER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SONYA PATEL AND SUMEET BHATIA'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S OMNIBUS MOTION TO SEEK DISQUALIFICATION, CONTINUE HEARING AND TRIAL DATE

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF ANTHONY PATEL'S OMNIBUS MOTION TO SEEK DISQUALIFICATION, CONTINUE HEARING AND TRIAL DATES, CHANGE VENUE, CONSOLIDATE CIVIL CASES, AND OTHER ASSOCIATED RELIEF

8/15/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF ANTHONY PATEL'S OMNIBUS MOTION TO SEEK DISQUALIFICATION, CONTINUE HEARING AND TRIAL DATES, CHANGE VENUE, CONSOLIDATE CIVIL CASES, AND OTHER ASSOCIATED RELIEF

Proof of Service by Mail

8/20/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SUMEET BHATIA'S DEMURRER

8/20/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SUMEET BHATIA'S DEMURRER

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SUMEET BHATIA'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

8/20/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SUMEET BHATIA'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

Request for Judicial Notice - PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S PENDING DEMURRER TO THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT IN THIS CASE

8/20/2019: Request for Judicial Notice - PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S PENDING DEMURRER TO THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT IN THIS CASE

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/20/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/20/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/20/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Reply - PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO THE OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS TO THE PLAINTIFF'S OMNIBUS MOTION TO SEEK DISQUALIFICATION, CONTINUE HEARING AND TRIAL DATES, CHANGE VENUE, CONSOLIDATE CIVL CASES AND OTHER A

8/22/2019: Reply - PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO THE OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS TO THE PLAINTIFF'S OMNIBUS MOTION TO SEEK DISQUALIFICATION, CONTINUE HEARING AND TRIAL DATES, CHANGE VENUE, CONSOLIDATE CIVL CASES AND OTHER A

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/26/2019: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS COURT REGARDING ORDER STRIKING STATEMENT OF DISQU...)

8/27/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS COURT REGARDING ORDER STRIKING STATEMENT OF DISQU...)

Order - ORDER STRIKING STATEMENT OF DISQUALIFICATION; VERIFIED ANSWER

8/27/2019: Order - ORDER STRIKING STATEMENT OF DISQUALIFICATION; VERIFIED ANSWER

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (IN CHAMBERS COURT REGARDING ORDER STRIKING STATEMENT OF DISQU...) OF 08/27/2019

8/27/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (IN CHAMBERS COURT REGARDING ORDER STRIKING STATEMENT OF DISQU...) OF 08/27/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER OMNIBUS MOTION TO SEEK DISQUALIFICA...)

8/28/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER OMNIBUS MOTION TO SEEK DISQUALIFICA...)

Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF JEREMY J. OSHER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SONYA PATEL AND SUMEET BHATIA'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF ANTHONY PATEL'S OMNIBUS MOTION TO SEEK DISQUALIF

8/28/2019: Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF JEREMY J. OSHER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SONYA PATEL AND SUMEET BHATIA'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF ANTHONY PATEL'S OMNIBUS MOTION TO SEEK DISQUALIF

201 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B303228); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 37; Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 37; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/07/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Anthony A. Patel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Anthony A. Patel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketAppellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA: 12/23/19 B303228); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 37; Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 37; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Deposition) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
310 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketEx-Parte Application; Filed by Anthony A. Patel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-09-07 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference filed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT 1. VIOLATION OF CIVIL RIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Anthony A. Patel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2013
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Anthony A. Patel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOREN OSHER & LUFTMAN LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA REGENTS is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE BAR OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCINTIRE, CHRISTOPHER A