This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/04/2022 at 05:58:32 (UTC).

ANNIE WILLIAMS VS GRIFFITH PARK REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/11/2022 ANNIE WILLIAMS filed an Other lawsuit against GRIFFITH PARK REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is COLIN P. LEIS. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0132

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

COLIN P. LEIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMS ANNIE

Defendants

GRIFFITH PARK REHABILITATION CENTER LLC

RENEW HEALTH CONSULTING SERVICES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEDBY DAVID

 

Court Documents

Notice of Related Case

4/11/2022: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASE)

4/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASE) OF 04/14/2022

4/14/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASE) OF 04/14/2022

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/16/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Motion to Enforce Settlement

5/16/2022: Motion to Enforce Settlement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/16/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

5/23/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Request for Dismissal

5/24/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

5/24/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

5/24/2022: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL]

5/25/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL]

Request for Dismissal

7/6/2022: Request for Dismissal

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/11/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/11/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/11/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/11/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF LINDA JOHNSON AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO ANNIE WILLIAMS

3/11/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF LINDA JOHNSON AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO ANNIE WILLIAMS

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department X; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Annie Williams (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Request for Dismissal]); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Annie Williams (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Annie Williams (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Colin P. Leis, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department X; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Annie Williams (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Related Case)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Related Case) of 04/14/2022); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Annie Williams (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (of Linda Johnson as Successor in Interest to Annie Williams); Filed by Annie Williams (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Annie Williams (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Annie Williams (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Annie Williams (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less