This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/04/2021 at 02:42:30 (UTC).

ANNIE CRUSE VS ARTURO VASQUEZ LOPEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/20/2017 ANNIE CRUSE filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ARTURO VASQUEZ LOPEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOEL L. LOFTON, CHRISTOPHER K. LUI, DANIEL M. CROWLEY and STEPHEN M. MOLONEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5738

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOEL L. LOFTON

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

STEPHEN M. MOLONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CRUSE ANNIE

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Defendants and Not Classified By Court

LOPEZ ARTURO VASQUEZ

DOES 1 TO 30

GRAMAJO YOLANDA SANTIZO

TANA KATERINA

VASQUEZ-LOPEZ ARTURO

ROES 1-20

SANTIZO GRAMAJO

ROES 1 THROUGH 10

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Not Classified By Court

TANA KATERINA

VASQUEZ-LOPEZ ARTURO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

NOVAK SEAN M. ESQ.

NOVAK SEAN MICHAEL

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LOPEZ YOLANDA

HOLTZ CRAIG A. LAW OFFICE OF

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

DUNKIN CRAIG LEE

REDFIELD RYAN P.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

HOLTZ CRAIG A. LAW OFFICE OF

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

DUNKIN CRAIG LEE

REDFIELD RYAN P.

 

Court Documents

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

8/7/2020: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) AS TO DEFENDAN...)

7/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) AS TO DEFENDAN...)

Notice - NOTICE P NTC OF RULING

2/4/2020: Notice - NOTICE P NTC OF RULING

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

9/26/2019: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Notice - NOTICE OF OSC RE DEFAULT AND OSC RE DISMISSAL

9/30/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF OSC RE DEFAULT AND OSC RE DISMISSAL

Order - Dismissal

6/20/2019: Order - Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF OSC RE DEFAULT AND OSC RE DISMISSAL

6/20/2019: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF OSC RE DEFAULT AND OSC RE DISMISSAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/10/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED

4/9/2019: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED

Summons - Summons To Cross-Complaint

1/14/2019: Summons - Summons To Cross-Complaint

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Responses to Judicial Council For...)

12/12/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Responses to Judicial Council For...)

Opposition - Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's Form Interrogatories (Set Two), Demand for Identification and Production of Documents (Set Two)

12/20/2018: Opposition - Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's Form Interrogatories (Set Two), Demand for Identification and Production of Documents (Set Two)

Motion to Compel - Motion to Compel Responses to Judicial Council Form Interrogatories (Set Two), Demand for Identification and Production of Documents (Set two)

11/20/2018: Motion to Compel - Motion to Compel Responses to Judicial Council Form Interrogatories (Set Two), Demand for Identification and Production of Documents (Set two)

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE); ETC.

3/13/2018: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE); ETC.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/13/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/29/2017: SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

8/29/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR EQUITABLE INDEMNIFICATION AND CONTRIBUTION, DECLARATORY RELIEF, AND APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT

8/29/2017: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR EQUITABLE INDEMNIFICATION AND CONTRIBUTION, DECLARATORY RELIEF, AND APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • Hearing04/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 as to defendant, Yolanda Santizo Gramajo) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to File Default...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (as to defendant Arturo Vasquez-Lopez) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 as to defendant, Yolanda Santizo Gramajo) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) as to defendan...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketNotice (P Notice of Ruling); Filed by Annie Cruse (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (as to defendant Arturo Vasquez-Lopez) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 as to defendant, Yolanda Santizo Gramajo) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2017
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Defendant and Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Annie Cruse (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Annie Cruse (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Annie Cruse (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC665738    Hearing Date: February 02, 2021    Dept: 28

Request for Default Judgment

Having considered all documents submitted in support of a default judgment, the Court rules as follows.

BACKGROUND

On June 20, 2017, Plaintiff Annie Cruse (“Cruse” or “Plaintiff”) filed a complaint against Arturo Vasquez-Lopez, Yolanda Santizo Gramajo, and Katerina Tana for motor vehicle negligence based on incidents that occurred on July 1, 2015, July 20, 2015, and November 15, 2015.

On August 29, 2017, Defendant/Cross-Complainant Katerina Tana (“Tana”) filed a cross-complaint against Arturo Vasquez-Lopez and Yolanda Santizo Gramajo (“Gramajo”) for equitable indemnification and contribution, declaratory relief, and appointment of fault.

On September 20, 2017, Cruse filed a default application against Gramajo. Default was entered on the same date.

On February 14, 2018, Defendant/Cross-Complainant Arturo Vasquez-Lopez filed a cross-complaint against Gramajo and Tana for equitable indemnity, comparative indemnity, and declaratory relief.

On April 26, 2019, Tana dismissed her cross-complaint without prejudice.

On June 13, 2020, Cruse dismissed her complaint against Tana with prejudice.

On June 20, 2020, the Court ordered Defendant/Cross-Complainant Arturo Vasquez-Lopez’s cross-complaint against Tana, Gramajo, and Roes 1 through 10 dismissed without prejudice.

On September 10, 2020, Plaintiff orally dismissed Defendant Arturo Vasquez-Lopez from the Complaint.

Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 as to Defendant, Yolanda Santizo Gramajo is scheduled for September 10, 2020.

PARTY’S REQUEST

Plaintiff requests the Court to enter a default judgment against Defendant Yolanda Santizo Gramajo and award Plaintiff $595,262.00

DISCUSSION

The Court finds the application for default judgment filed on August 7, 2020 denied.

There are a number of issues with the packet. Plaintiff has not filed the required CIV-100 Form. There are no authentications for submitted exhibits. Plaintiff has not put Defendant Yolanda Santizo Gramajo on notice of the amount sought in the complaint. Plaintiff did not file a statement of damages or proof of service of such. Plaintiff has not dismissed Does 1 through 30.

Accordingly, Plaintiff’s application for entry of default judgment is denied.

CONCLUSION

The application for default judgment filed on August 7, 2020 is DENIED.

Plaintiff is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

The parties are directed to the header of this tentative ruling for further instructions.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer REDFIELD RYAN P.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DUNKIN CRAIG L.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOLTZ CRAIG A. LAW OFFICE OF