This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/28/2021 at 00:26:33 (UTC).

ANNETTE MILLER FOLLETTE VS VAZGEN REYHANIAN

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 ANNETTE MILLER FOLLETTE filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against VAZGEN REYHANIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4301

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MILLER FOLLETTE ANNETTE

Defendant

REYHANIAN VAZGEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHABY DAVID M. II

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2024
  • Hearing04/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • Hearing10/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • Hearing09/29/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Annette Miller Follette (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Annette Miller Follette (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Annette Miller Follette (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Annette Miller Follette (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHABY DAVID MICHAEL II