This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/03/2021 at 19:11:58 (UTC).

ANNETTA KIDD VS TODAY'S FRESH START CHARTER SCHOOL, A CALIFORNIA CHARTER SCHOOL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/12/2020 ANNETTA KIDD filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against TODAY'S FRESH START CHARTER SCHOOL, A CALIFORNIA CHARTER SCHOOL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3370

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIDD ANNETTA

Defendants

RAMON RAUL

TODAY'S FRESH START CHARTER SCHOOL A CALIFORNIA CHARTER SCHOOL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

TURNER STACIE LYNN

Other Attorneys

LOVRETOVICH JOSEPH M.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/16/2021: Request for Dismissal

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT TODAYS FRESH START CHARTER SCHOOLS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF ANNETTA KIDDS COMPLAINT

1/14/2021: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT TODAYS FRESH START CHARTER SCHOOLS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF ANNETTA KIDDS COMPLAINT

Substitution of Attorney

1/26/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Case Management Statement

1/27/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/27/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

2/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF SERVICE/ FILING OF RESPONSIV...)

3/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF SERVICE/ FILING OF RESPONSIV...)

Proof of Personal Service

4/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF SERVICE/ FILING OF RESPONSIV...)

5/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF SERVICE/ FILING OF RESPONSIV...)

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

6/4/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Answer

6/29/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FILING OF RESPONSIVE PLEADING OR ENTR...)

6/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FILING OF RESPONSIVE PLEADING OR ENTR...)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/22/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/20/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/20/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/12/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/12/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/12/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (With prejudice, Entire Action); Filed by Annetta Kidd (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: (Filing of Responsive Pleading or Entry of Default as to Defendant Raul Ramon) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Filing of Responsive Pleading or Entr...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Raul Ramon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Annetta Kidd (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: (Proof of Service/ Filing of Responsive Pleading as to Defendant Raul Ramon) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Proof of Service/ Filing of Responsiv...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Annetta Kidd (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: (Proof of Service/ Filing of Responsive Pleading as to Defendant Raul Ramon) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Proof of Service/ Filing of Responsiv...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Annetta Kidd (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Today's Fresh Start Charter School, a California charter school (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketAnswer (DEFENDANT TODAY?S FRESH START CHARTER SCHOOL?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF ANNETTA KIDD?S COMPLAINT); Filed by Today's Fresh Start Charter School, a California charter school (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Annetta Kidd (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Annetta Kidd (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Annetta Kidd (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Annetta Kidd (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TODAY'S FRESH START INC. A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT BENEFIT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOVRETOVICH, JOSEPH M