This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2019 at 05:27:09 (UTC).

ANNE PEARL VAUGHN REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 ANNE PEARL VAUGHN REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3943

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JOHNSON ERNEST

Not Classified By Court

ANNE PEARL VAUGHN REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LEWELLYN LARRY DARRYL

 

Court Documents

PR_General Probate - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - CENTRAL PROBATE

5/5/2017: PR_General Probate - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - CENTRAL PROBATE

Notice - Commencement of Court Supervised Trust

5/1/2017: Notice - Commencement of Court Supervised Trust

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2017
  • Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • Notice - Commencement of Court Supervised Trust; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less