This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 09:43:23 (UTC).

ANNE M SPRADLEY VS WESTERN NATIONAL BUILDERS ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/26/2018 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by ANNE M SPRADLEY against WESTERN NATIONAL BUILDERS in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1820

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SPRADLEY ANNE M.

Defendants and Respondents

LOS ANGELES THE COUNTY OF

LOS ANGELES THE CITY OF

DOES 1-25

WESTERN NATIONAL BUILDERS

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

7/27/2018: Minute Order

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTIONS TO COMPEL AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

7/27/2018: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTIONS TO COMPEL AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' MOTIONS TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, AND DEMAND TO PRODUCE CERTAIN DOCUNENTS AND ITEMS, AND F

8/1/2018: NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' MOTIONS TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, AND DEMAND TO PRODUCE CERTAIN DOCUNENTS AND ITEMS, AND F

Notice of Lien

11/14/2018: Notice of Lien

Cross-Complaint

3/19/2019: Cross-Complaint

Request for Dismissal

3/29/2019: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

4/11/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

4/26/2019: Answer

Ex Parte Application

5/10/2019: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

5/10/2019: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/30/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

SUMMONS

2/28/2018: SUMMONS

WESTERN NATIONAL BUILDERS? ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

2/28/2018: WESTERN NATIONAL BUILDERS? ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEMAND FOR JURY

2/28/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY

DEFENDANT, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

2/28/2018: DEFENDANT, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

2/5/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

2/5/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. NEGLIGENCE PER SE

1/26/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. NEGLIGENCE PER SE

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2021
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; : OSC RE Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • Hearingat 10:00 AM in Department 3 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to continue trial and related dates) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to continue trial and related...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES); Filed by Harry H. Joh Construction, inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketOrder (PROPOSED ORDER TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES); Filed by Harry H. Joh Construction, inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Harry H. Joh Construction, inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketWESTERN NATIONAL BUILDERS CROSS-COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Anne M. Spradley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Anne M. Spradley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Anne M. Spradley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Anne M. Spradley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. NEGLIGENCE PER SE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC691820    Hearing Date: November 01, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

ANNE M. SPRADLEY,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

WESTERN NATIONAL BUILDERS, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC691820

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

November 1, 2019

1. Background Facts

Plaintiff, Anne M. Spradley filed this action against Defendants, Western National Builders, City of Los Angeles, and County of Los Angeles for damages arising out of a bicycle accident. Plaintiff subsequently dismissed the City and Western National Builders. Plaintiff also added Harry H. Joh Construction, Inc. as a doe defendant in the action.

2. Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint

At this time, Harry H. Joh seeks leave to file a cross-complaint against Horizons Construction Company International, Inc. for indemnification and related claims. Defendant contend the cross-defendant is the entity responsible for the trench that caused Plaintiff’s injuries. Additionally, Defendant contends the parties have a contract that requires Horizon to indemnify it in connection with this action.

A cross-complaint against any of the parties who filed the initial complaint or cross-complaint against the cross-complainant must be filed before or at the same time as the answer to the initial complaint or cross-complaint, which answer must be filed within 30 days of service of the complaint or cross-complaint. (CCP §§ 412.20(a)(3), 428.50(a), 432.10.) Any other cross-complaint may be filed at any time before the court has set a trial date. (CCP §428.50(b).) If a party fails to file a cross-complaint within the time limits described above, he or she must obtain permission from the court to file the cross-complaint. (CCP §§ 426.50, 428.50(c).) Permission to file a permissive cross-complaint may be granted in the interest of justice at any time during the course of the action. (CCP § 428.50(c).)

Defendant has properly served all parties with a copy of this motion, and no party has opposed the motion. Trial is not scheduled until 3/26/20, and therefore no party will be prejudiced by the filing of the cross-complaint. Defendant is ordered to file a separate copy of the cross-complaint within five days.

Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.