This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2019 at 03:31:11 (UTC).

ANNE LAFIANZA VS COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/28/2017 ANNE LAFIANZA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8607

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LAFIANZA ANNE

Respondents and Defendants

COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BAER TRACY ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

MURCHISON & CUMMING LAW OFFICES OF

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

12/28/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

12/28/2017: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/18/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Notice of Ruling

5/9/2019: Notice of Ruling

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION TO COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF ANNE LAFIANZA

2/7/2018: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION TO COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF ANNE LAFIANZA

CIVIL DEPOSIT

2/7/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

2/7/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANT COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION TO COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF ANNE LAFIANZA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Anne Lafianza (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****8607    Hearing Date: January 28, 2020    Dept: 29

Lafianza v. Costco Wholesale Corporation

The Unopposed Motion for an Order Continuing Trial is GRANTED IN PART. The trial is continued to June 12, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. The final status conference is continued to May 29 at 10:00 a.m.

Good cause has not been shown for a continuance to September. The fact that Plaintiff has ongoing medical issues for which future treatment is expected is not good cause for a continuance of the trial. Experts can testify as to Plaintiff’s expected future treatment and prognosis. A continuance to June 12, 2020 is sufficient to allow the parties time to complete the outstanding discovery.

The trial date is firm. The parties are ordered to inform their witnesses of the new trial date immediately. No further continuances should be expected. The parties must diligently prepare for trial, including expert discovery, even if they are hopeful that the case will settle.

Discovery and all other trial related deadlines are to be determined based on the new trial date.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, a Washington Corporation is a litigant