*******0165
01/03/2022
Other
Other
Los Angeles, California
ROBERT B. BROADBELT
FORD ANNE BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST WILLIAM PERRY FORD
FORD WILLIAM PERRY
FORD JOHN WESLEY
GT MADISON REALTY LLC
KNIGHT CHERYL
LAVERNOVICH PATTI
MADISON REALTY EQUITIES LLC
OAK PARK MANOR LP
QUALITY HEALTHCARE ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC
FELDMAN IAN R
GHARIBIAN ARTIN ESQ.
WALKER KATHLEEN
1/3/2022: Complaint
4/13/2023: Request for Dismissal
3/10/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/10/2023
3/10/2023: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; COMPLAINT; AS TO DEFENDANT, OAK PARK MANOR, LP ONLY;
3/10/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
2/22/2023: Notice of Settlement
8/31/2022: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OSC RE NON-APPEARING PARTIES
8/23/2022: Order - TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER
8/23/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL...)
8/8/2022: Case Management Statement
8/8/2022: Case Management Statement
8/8/2022: Case Management Statement
6/15/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
6/15/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
6/15/2022: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
6/15/2022: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
5/3/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
5/4/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal With Prejudice; Entire action of all parties and all causes of action;: Name Extension: With Prejudice; Entire action of all parties and all causes of action; ; Result Date: 04/14/2023 ; As To Parties: ANNE FORD, by and through her Successor-in-Interest, William Perry Ford (Plaintiff); WILLIAM PERRY FORD (Plaintiff); OAK PARK MANOR, LP (Defendant) et al.
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 05/22/2023 at 11:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/14/2023
[-] Read LessDocketOn the Complaint filed by ANNE FORD, by and through her Successor-in-Interest, William Perry Ford, et al. on 01/03/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by ANNE FORD, by and through her Successor-in-Interest, William Perry Ford and WILLIAM PERRY FORD as to the entire action
[-] Read LessDocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: ANNE FORD, by and through her Successor-in-Interest, William Perry Ford (Plaintiff); WILLIAM PERRY FORD (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketOn the Complaint filed by ANNE FORD, by and through her Successor-in-Interest, William Perry Ford, et al. on 01/03/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by ANNE FORD, by and through her Successor-in-Interest, William Perry Ford and WILLIAM PERRY FORD as to OAK PARK MANOR, LP
[-] Read LessDocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: ANNE FORD, by and through her Successor-in-Interest, William Perry Ford (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal With Prejudice; Complaint; As to Defendant, Oak Park Manor, LP only;: Name Extension: With Prejudice; Complaint; As to Defendant, Oak Park Manor, LP only; ; Result Date: 03/10/2023 ; As To Parties: OAK PARK MANOR, LP (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 05/22/2023 at 11:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53
[-] Read LessDocketMinute Order (Court Order)
[-] Read LessDocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 03/10/2023; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketAddress for Artin Gharibian, Esq. (Attorney) updated
[-] Read LessDocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Hon. Robert B. Broadbelt in Department 53 Stanley Mosk Courthouse
[-] Read LessDocketUpdated -- Artin Gharibian, Esq. (Attorney): Name Suffix: Esq.
[-] Read LessDocketComplaint; Filed by: ANNE FORD, by and through her Successor-in-Interest, William Perry Ford (Plaintiff); WILLIAM PERRY FORD (Plaintiff); As to: OAK PARK MANOR, LP (Defendant); GT MADISON REALTY LLC (Defendant); MADISON REALTY EQUITIES, LLC (Defendant) et al.
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ANNE FORD, by and through her Successor-in-Interest, William Perry Ford (Plaintiff); WILLIAM PERRY FORD (Plaintiff); As to: OAK PARK MANOR, LP (Defendant); GT MADISON REALTY LLC (Defendant); MADISON REALTY EQUITIES, LLC (Defendant) et al.
[-] Read LessDocketDeclaration OF WILLIAM PERRY FORD (AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO ANNE FORD PURSUANT TO CCP 377.32); Filed by: ANNE FORD, by and through her Successor-in-Interest, William Perry Ford (Plaintiff); WILLIAM PERRY FORD (Plaintiff); As to: OAK PARK MANOR, LP (Defendant); GT MADISON REALTY LLC (Defendant); MADISON REALTY EQUITIES, LLC (Defendant) et al.
[-] Read LessDocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ANNE FORD, by and through her Successor-in-Interest, William Perry Ford (Plaintiff); WILLIAM PERRY FORD (Plaintiff); As to: OAK PARK MANOR, LP (Defendant); GT MADISON REALTY LLC (Defendant); MADISON REALTY EQUITIES, LLC (Defendant) et al.
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read Less