This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2023 at 01:41:56 (UTC).

ANNE FORD, BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST, WILLIAM PERRY FORD, ET AL. VS OAK PARK MANOR, LP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/03/2022 ANNE FORD, BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST, WILLIAM PERRY FORD, filed an Other lawsuit against OAK PARK MANOR, LP,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0165

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FORD ANNE BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST WILLIAM PERRY FORD

FORD WILLIAM PERRY

Defendants

FORD JOHN WESLEY

GT MADISON REALTY LLC

KNIGHT CHERYL

LAVERNOVICH PATTI

MADISON REALTY EQUITIES LLC

OAK PARK MANOR LP

QUALITY HEALTHCARE ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

FELDMAN IAN R

GHARIBIAN ARTIN ESQ.

WALKER KATHLEEN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/3/2022: Complaint

Request for Dismissal

4/13/2023: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/10/2023

3/10/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/10/2023

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; COMPLAINT; AS TO DEFENDANT, OAK PARK MANOR, LP ONLY;

3/10/2023: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; COMPLAINT; AS TO DEFENDANT, OAK PARK MANOR, LP ONLY;

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/10/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Settlement

2/22/2023: Notice of Settlement

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OSC RE NON-APPEARING PARTIES

8/31/2022: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OSC RE NON-APPEARING PARTIES

Order - TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

8/23/2022: Order - TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL...)

8/23/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL...)

Case Management Statement

8/8/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/8/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/8/2022: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/15/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/15/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

6/15/2022: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

6/15/2022: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/3/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/4/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal With Prejudice; Entire action of all parties and all causes of action;: Name Extension: With Prejudice; Entire action of all parties and all causes of action; ; Result Date: 04/14/2023 ; As To Parties: ANNE FORD, by and through her Successor-in-Interest, William Perry Ford (Plaintiff); WILLIAM PERRY FORD (Plaintiff); OAK PARK MANOR, LP (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 05/22/2023 at 11:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/14/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by ANNE FORD, by and through her Successor-in-Interest, William Perry Ford, et al. on 01/03/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by ANNE FORD, by and through her Successor-in-Interest, William Perry Ford and WILLIAM PERRY FORD as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: ANNE FORD, by and through her Successor-in-Interest, William Perry Ford (Plaintiff); WILLIAM PERRY FORD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by ANNE FORD, by and through her Successor-in-Interest, William Perry Ford, et al. on 01/03/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by ANNE FORD, by and through her Successor-in-Interest, William Perry Ford and WILLIAM PERRY FORD as to OAK PARK MANOR, LP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: ANNE FORD, by and through her Successor-in-Interest, William Perry Ford (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal With Prejudice; Complaint; As to Defendant, Oak Park Manor, LP only;: Name Extension: With Prejudice; Complaint; As to Defendant, Oak Park Manor, LP only; ; Result Date: 03/10/2023 ; As To Parties: OAK PARK MANOR, LP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 05/22/2023 at 11:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 03/10/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketAddress for Artin Gharibian, Esq. (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Robert B. Broadbelt in Department 53 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Artin Gharibian, Esq. (Attorney): Name Suffix: Esq.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ANNE FORD, by and through her Successor-in-Interest, William Perry Ford (Plaintiff); WILLIAM PERRY FORD (Plaintiff); As to: OAK PARK MANOR, LP (Defendant); GT MADISON REALTY LLC (Defendant); MADISON REALTY EQUITIES, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ANNE FORD, by and through her Successor-in-Interest, William Perry Ford (Plaintiff); WILLIAM PERRY FORD (Plaintiff); As to: OAK PARK MANOR, LP (Defendant); GT MADISON REALTY LLC (Defendant); MADISON REALTY EQUITIES, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketDeclaration OF WILLIAM PERRY FORD (AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO ANNE FORD PURSUANT TO CCP 377.32); Filed by: ANNE FORD, by and through her Successor-in-Interest, William Perry Ford (Plaintiff); WILLIAM PERRY FORD (Plaintiff); As to: OAK PARK MANOR, LP (Defendant); GT MADISON REALTY LLC (Defendant); MADISON REALTY EQUITIES, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ANNE FORD, by and through her Successor-in-Interest, William Perry Ford (Plaintiff); WILLIAM PERRY FORD (Plaintiff); As to: OAK PARK MANOR, LP (Defendant); GT MADISON REALTY LLC (Defendant); MADISON REALTY EQUITIES, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less