This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2023 at 10:37:11 (UTC).

ANNALIZA LEGASPI VS LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/25/2022 ANNALIZA LEGASPI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE W. MANDEL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1982

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELAINE W. MANDEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEGASPI ANNALIZA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY

TUTOR PERINI CORPORATION

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOOD SCOTT M.

Defendant Attorney

MILLS HEATHER LYNN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/5/2023: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/14/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

2/23/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT STATE OF CALIFORNIA AND CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

2/23/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT STATE OF CALIFORNIA AND CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Case Management Statement

2/7/2023: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/7/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

2/1/2023: Case Management Statement

Answer

12/21/2022: Answer

Cross-Complaint

12/21/2022: Cross-Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

11/8/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/8/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/7/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/3/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/26/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

10/26/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/25/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/25/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

10/25/2022: Complaint

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 05/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 12/01/2023 at 09:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 12/11/2023 at 09:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Annaliza Legaspi on 10/25/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Annaliza Legaspi as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Annaliza Legaspi (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Defendant); Tutor Perini Corporation (Defendant); California Department of Transportation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Defendant); Tutor Perini Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Annaliza Legaspi (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Annaliza Legaspi (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Defendant); Tutor Perini Corporation (Defendant); California Department of Transportation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: As To Parties: ; Status changed from Filed to Rejected

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: As To Parties: ; Status changed from Filed to Rejected

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark A. Young in Department M Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Santa Monica Courthouse in Department P - Hon. Elaine W. Mandeleffective 10/25/2022; Reason: Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Annaliza Legaspi (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Defendant); Tutor Perini Corporation (Defendant); California Department of Transportation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Annaliza Legaspi (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Defendant); Tutor Perini Corporation (Defendant); California Department of Transportation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Annaliza Legaspi (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Defendant); Tutor Perini Corporation (Defendant); California Department of Transportation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less